Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:25-cv-00421
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC
1000 Lowe's Boulevard
Mooresville, PA 28117
Plaintiff
Donald Neville
616 Panther Road
Warminster, PA 18974
Represented By
MATTHEW E. GALLAGHER
Swartz Culleton Ferris
contact info
Plaintiff
Doris Neville
H/W 616 Panther Road
Warminster, PA 18974
Represented By
MATTHEW E. GALLAGHER
Swartz Culleton Ferris
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/11 11:47 AM
ORDER THAT RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/29/2025 11:00 AM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 10:41 AM
Lowe's ANSWER to Complaint together with no by Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC.(PERRY, MARC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 02/24 8:50 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Crystal Rivers re: served Plaintiff's Civil Acton Complaint with Notice to Defend and Summons upon Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC by Personal Service on 02/06/2025 (GALLAGHER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/24/25. (va)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/24 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT IN CIVIL ACTION against Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18027115.), filed by Donald Neville, Doris Neville.(GALLAGHER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form