Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: John D Love
Case #: 6:25-cv-00026
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph Huntington
Represented By
Lisa K. Hooper
Lynch, Chappell & Alsup
contact info
Jackson Ross Willingham
Lynch, Chappell & Alsup, PC
contact info
Defendant
Todpat, LLC
Represented By
Lisa K. Hooper
Lynch, Chappell & Alsup
contact info
Jackson Ross Willingham
Lynch, Chappell & Alsup, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvin Bailey
Represented By
Sharon Kaye Campbell
Sharon Campbell
contact info
Emanuel Kataev
Consumer Attorneys PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Fri 02/28 2:45 PM
Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas, Midland-Odessa Division. (wea)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 2:41 PM
ORDER TO TRANSFER. Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer8 is GRANTED. It isORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Midland-Odessa Division of the Western District of Texas for all future proceedings immediately forthwith (Motion(s)8 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/28/2025. (wea)
Related: [-]
service Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 02/28 3:25 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. CASE: 6:25-cv-00026 DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Western District of Texas as case 7:25-cv-00099, filed 02/28/2025. (wea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 respm Response to Motion Wed 02/26 10:20 PM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue opposing dismissal but consenting to transfer filed by Alvin Bailey . (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/19 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackson Ross Willingham on behalf of All Defendants (Willingham, Jackson)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 02/19 4:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by All Defendants.(Hooper, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Sally Mendoza,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Joseph Huntington,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Dismiss or Transfer
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/04 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Bailey. Joseph Huntington served on 1/29/2025. (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/04 9:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Bailey. Todpat, LLC served on 1/29/2025. (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/04 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emanuel Kataev on behalf of Alvin Bailey (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/30 10:41 AM
ORDER designating Magistrate Judge John D. Love to the full extent authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) to handle this matter. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 1/30/2025. (wea)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 4 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 5:10 PM
ORDER REGULATING PRACTICE. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (wea)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Joseph Huntington and Todpat.(ndc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT Alvin Bailey against Todpat ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10639514.), filed by Alvin Bailey.(Campbell, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Fri 01/24 5:04 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alvin Bailey. (wea)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/24 5:09 PM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (wea)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 01/24 5:10 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (wea)
Related: [-]