Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:25-cv-00152
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 2:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Foundever Operating Corporation
Represented By
Luke W Molleck
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jashyua Thomas
Represented By
Kathryn Bain
Bain Mazza & Debski LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 05/06 3:26 PM
ORDER denying6 Motion to Dismiss as moot, without prejudice to refile. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/6/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
21 21 minord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 3:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/6/2025. The parties have filed a joint notice of settlement. (ECF No. 20 ). So, the Court VACATES the early neutral evaluation scheduled for May 19, 2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
20 20 notice Notice Other Mon 05/05 4:34 PM
NOTICE JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Foundever Operating Corporation. (Grandgenett, Roger)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 04/16 4:54 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 04/16 4:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/18/2025. Motions due by 9/17/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/16/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation Tue 04/15 2:30 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER SUBMITTED IN COMPLIANCE WITH L.R. 26-1(b) by Plaintiff Jashyua Thomas. (Bain, Kathryn) (other) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 minord Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Mon 04/14 4:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/14/2025. The parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order ("DPSO") is past due in this case. ECF No. 6 (setting DPSO deadline for 4/4/25). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed DPSO by 4/28/2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BCI)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 respm Reply Mon 03/17 1:54 PM
REPLY to Response to6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Foundever Operating Corporation. (Grandgenett, Roger)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/12 2:06 PM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. The Early Neutral Evaluation scheduled for April 28, 2025 is VACATED and RESET for May 19, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the written evaluation statements are due by 4:00 p.m. on May 12, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other provisions of the Court's order (ECF No.9 ) shall remain in effect. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/11/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 motion Stipulation Mon 03/10 2:50 PM
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION by Plaintiff Jashyua Thomas. (Bain, Kathryn) (continue) (ene)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/07 4:09 PM
ORDER Granting11 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re6 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/7/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 motion Stipulation Thu 03/06 4:34 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Foundever Operating Corporation. (Molleck, Luke) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 respm Response Mon 03/03 2:32 PM
RESPONSE to6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jashyua Thomas. Replies due by 3/10/2025. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Thu 02/27 4:48 PM
ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/28/2025 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/26/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 notice ENE Notice Thu 02/20 3:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 02/18 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Foundever Operating Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Foundever Worldwide Corporation for Foundever Operating Corporation added. (Molleck, Luke)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion Dismiss Tue 02/18 2:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, by Defendant Foundever Operating Corporation. Responses due by 3/4/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/28/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/4/2025. (Molleck, Luke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/29 4:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jashyua Thomas. Foundever Operating Corporation served on 1/29/2025. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order Mon 01/27 7:55 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 4:18 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Foundever Operating Corporation re1 Complaint. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 01/24 12:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jashyua Thomas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Foundever Operating Corporation (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7935161) by Jashyua Thomas. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/3/2025. Proof of service due by 4/24/2025. (Bain, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 01/24 4:11 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ALZ)
Related: [-]