New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:25-cv-00746
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Petitioner
Italian Diplomatic Academy
Represented By
Thanbir Ahmed
Hollander Law Group PLLC
contact info
Larry B. Hollander
Hollander Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Respondent
International Model United Nations Association, Incorporated
Represented By
Chris Michael LaRocco
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/20 5:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING SCHEDULE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Petitioner and Respondent, through their respective counsel as set forth below, that: 1) Petitioner shall file an Amended Petition on or before April 7, 2025; 2) The time for Respondent to respond to the Petition shall be stayed until Petitioner files an Amended Petition; 3) Within 14 days of the filing of the Amended Petition, Petitioner and Respondent will file a stipulated proposed briefing schedule in connection with the Amended Petition, subject to approval of the Court; 4) No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of any claim or defense by either Petitioner or Respondent, and each party expressly reserves any and all claims and defenses; and 5) This Stipulation and Order may be executed in counterparts and exchanged via facsimile or electronic mail, and the facsimile or electronic copy of this Stipulation may be filed with the Court in lieu of the original. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/20/2025) ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2025.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 02/14 2:29 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by International Model United Nations Association, Incorporated..(LaRocco, Chris)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chris Michael LaRocco on behalf of International Model United Nations Association, Incorporated..(LaRocco, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Other Mon 01/27 5:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Verified Petition with exhibits served on International Model United Nations Association Incorporated on January 27, 2025. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Italian Diplomatic Academy..(Hollander, Larry)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry B. Hollander on behalf of Italian Diplomatic Academy..(Hollander, Larry)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/27 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thanbir Ahmed. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 01/27 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thanbir Ahmed. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: International Model United Nations Association, Incorporated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 01/27 10:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thanbir Ahmed. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/27 11:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/27 11:28 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/27 11:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
1 1 13 pgs cmp Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Fri 01/24 5:00 PM
PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30513693).Document filed by Italian Diplomatic Academy..(Ahmed, Thanbir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Petition,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit Declaration of Thanbir Ahmed, Esq,
Att: 3 29 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Partial Final Award,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Settlment Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Working Agreement,
Att: 6 66 pgs Exhibit Exhibit D - Arbitration Demand and Fees,
Att: 7 69 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E - Answering Statement and Counterclaims with Exhibits,
Att: 8 13 pgs Exhibit Exhibit F - Reply to Counterclaims,
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit Exhibit G - Amended Request for Arbitration,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Transcript of Proceedings 2024.05.06 - Day 1,
Att: 11 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings 2024.05.07 - Day 2,
Att: 12 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings 2024.05.08 - Day 3,
Att: 13 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings 2024.05.09 - Day 1,
Att: 14 29 pgs Exhibit Exhibit L - IDA Pre Arbitration Brief,
Att: 15 75 pgs Exhibit Exhibit M - IMUNA's Pre Arbitration Brief,
Att: 16 53 pgs Exhibit IDA Post Arbitration Brief,
Att: 17 35 pgs Exhibit IMUNA Post Arbitration Brief,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit P - Non Renewal Notice IMUNA,
Att: 19 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Verified Petition to Vacate or Remand the PFA