Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Juan R Sanchez
Case #: 2:25-cv-00429
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
1515 ARCH STREET 15TH FLOOR
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19102
Represented By
Dorothy Hayes
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
LIEUTENANT NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245
1515 ARCH STREET 15TH FLOOR
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19102
Represented By
Dorothy Hayes
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
POLICE OFFICER JOHN/JANE DOE # 1-5
Plaintiff
DANIEL BOOTH
9301 VANDIKE STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19114
Represented By
RENAE B. AXELROD
Abramson & Denenberg, P.C.
contact info
ALAN E. DENENBERG
Abramson & Denenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 misc Report Of Tue 04/08 4:22 PM
Report Of Parties' Rule 26(f) Meeting by NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245. (Hayes, Dorothy) *FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE IN CORRECT CASE* Modified on 4/8/2025 (lisad, )
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/08 3:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DANIEL BOOTH. (DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/25 5:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Count IV (Conspiracy) by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245. (Hayes, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/25 5:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Parties' Conferral; Certificate of Service.(Hayes, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/25 5:37 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245.(Hayes, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/13 9:28 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA AND LIEUTENANT NICHOLAS COCOS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 4), AND PLAINTIFF DANIEL BOOTH HAVING SINCE FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THE MOTION IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/13/2025.3/13/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/12 4:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245, JOHN/JANE DOE # 1-5, filed by DANIEL BOOTH.(DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RENAE B. AXELROD on behalf of DANIEL BOOTH (AXELROD, RENAE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 3:02 PM
NOTICE by DANIEL BOOTH re4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Letter of Intent to File an Amended Complaint (DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/18 5:01 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245.Certificate of Conferral; Certificate of Service.(Hayes, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation to Dismiss Fed Mal Pros Claim
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 1/27/2025 (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Acceptance of Service Mon 01/27 12:53 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE City of Philadelphia and Lieutenant Nicholas Coco, Badge No. 245 by Milagros Colon Re: accepted summons and complaint for CITY OF PHILADELPHIA on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025; NICHOLAS COCO - BADGE NO. 245 on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025. (DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/24 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18027832.), filed by DANIEL BOOTH.(DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]