Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00075
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:31 AM CDT
Defendant
FS.COM, Inc.
Plaintiff
Vision Sphere Labs, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Joe
Buether Joe & Counselors, LLC
contact info
Michael William Doell
Buether Joe & Counselors, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 05/05 12:37 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at the termination of the case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 04/25 4:55 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/25/25. (jbe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/24 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC (Doell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to FS.COM, Inc.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/24 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael William Doell on behalf of Vision Sphere Labs, LLC (Doell, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 01/24 4:34 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 01/24 4:27 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC (Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Vision Sphere Labs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10640134.), filed by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/24 4:11 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 01/24 4:11 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]