Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:25-cv-00126
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 2:39 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/6/2025. By 5/20/2025, Plaintiff to FILE a signature page for his motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee or PAY the full filing fee. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without further notice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ray L Stevenson at Shawano County Jail)(jm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
23 23 appeal Appeal Fee Collection Letter Mon 05/05 10:15 AM
Appeal Fee Collection Letter from the Clerk of Court re22 USCA Mandate (cc: Warden / Officer in Charge, pro se plaintiff via USPS) (ams)
Related: [-]
22 22 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 05/05 10:06 AM
USCA Mandate (certified copy) as to7 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ray L Stevenson; USCA Number 25-1162 IT IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED, and this appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Although this appeal was filed before the district court issued a final decision in Stevensons case, if Stevenson does not prevail on his claims he can file a notice of appeal after the district court enters a final decision. This dismissal does not relieve the appellant of the obligation to pay the filing and docketing fees for this appeal. Ammons v. Gerlinger, 547 F.3d 724, 726 (7th Cir. 2008). The clerk of the district court shall collect the appellate fees from the prisoner's trust fund account using the mechanism of Section 1915(b). Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 433 (7th Cir. 1977). (ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
21 21 misc Letter Thu 04/03 4:56 PM
LETTER from Ray Stevenson re status update on case. (bx)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Fri 02/21 3:45 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/21/2025 DENYING18 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ray L Stevenson at Shawano County Jail)(jm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 misc Declaration Thu 02/20 12:20 PM
DECLARATION of Ray L Stevenson in support of Motion for Appeal IFP (bx)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Thu 02/20 12:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ray L Stevenson. (bx)
Related: [-]
17 17 appeal USCA Order Thu 02/20 12:18 PM
PLRA ORDER of USCA re7 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ray L Stevenson. The following is before the court: MOTION TO PROCEED ON APPEAL IN FORMAPAUPERIS, filed on February 18, 2025, by the pro se appellant. The pro se appellant has erroneously filed the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis in this court. The pro se appellant should have filed the motion in the district court in the first instance. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of this court transfer the motion to the clerk of the district court for a ruling on the motion, along with a copy of this order. The pro se appellant is reminded that if the district court denies the in forma pauperis motion, he/she must refile the motion in this court pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24. (bx)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Thu 02/06 9:08 AM
LETTER from Clerk to Plaintiff requesting a six month trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (kah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 02/04 2:20 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1162 USCA re:7 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ray L Stevenson. (bx)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter (From Court) Tue 02/04 12:35 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting a signed signature page for11 IFP Motion be returned within 10 days. (cc: mailed to Plaintiff) (kah)
Related: [-]
9 9 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 02/04 8:46 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re7 Notice of Appeal Prisoner (bx)
Related: [-]
8 8 appeal Pro Se Cover Letter Tue 02/04 8:41 AM
Pro Se Cover Letter re:7 Notice of Appeal Prisoner(bx)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/04 12:39 PM
Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case (copy mailed to Plaintiff). (kah)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
13 13 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 02/04 12:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ray L Stevenson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 02/04 12:16 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ray L Stevenson. (kah)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Tue 02/04 11:59 AM
(Unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ray L Stevenson. (kah)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Supplement Tue 02/04 11:58 AM
ADDENDUM by Ray L Stevenson re1 Complaint - Prisoner.(kah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
7 7 appeal Notice of Appeal Prisoner Tue 02/04 8:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ray L Stevenson (cc: all counsel)Newlin Notice to be sent by 4/3/2025 (bx)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 misc Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate Fri 01/24 4:04 PM
LETTER from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (kah)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 01/24 3:51 PM
DECLARATION of Ray L Stevenson in Support re4 Motion to Appoint Counsel (kah)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 01/24 3:49 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ray L Stevenson.(kah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Letters
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 01/24 3:47 PM
PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ray L Stevenson. (kah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 01/24 3:42 PM
TWO DECLARATIONS of Ray L. Stevenson in Support of Request for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (kah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Prisoner Fri 01/24 3:37 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against Scott Asplung, John Richard Fiske, John Luetcher by Ray L Stevenson.(kah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Request Export,
Att: 2 Letter from Clerk's Office,
Att: 3 Envelope