Minnesota District Court
Judge:Katherine M Menendez
Referred: Douglas L Micko
Case #: 0:25-cv-00295
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Karl E Robinson
Toohey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Edistributorz LLC
Represented By
R Daniel Rasmus
Hovland And Rasmus, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/14 8:24 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed on February 13, 2025 (ECF No. 6), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice and on the merits and without costs, disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party. Ordered by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/14/2025.(KAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 service Certificate of Service Thu 02/13 9:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re7 Proposed Order to Judge,6 Stipulation of Dismissal (Robinson, Karl)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 02/13 9:23 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Robinson, Karl)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/13 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Amazon.com, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Edistributorz LLC. (Robinson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 01/27 8:21 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 25-cv-295 KMM/DLM. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Mon 01/27 8:17 AM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Andrew M.Ayers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (kt)cc: Andrew M. Ayers. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate of Counsel Fri 01/24 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, by Karl E Robinson on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. (Robinson, Karl)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Fri 01/24 5:33 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Amazon.com, Inc.. (Robinson, Karl)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/24 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, Hennepin County District Court, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-CV-25-691 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11626444) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. No summons requested. (Robinson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet