Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00098
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 12:15 AM MST
Defendant
Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma (1)
Represented By
Michael J Bresnehan
Michael J Bresnehan PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Diamond J Zambrano
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/25/2025 12:59 AM MST
Thursday, December 12, 2024
Arrest of Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma on 12/12/2024. (AO) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma. (AO) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: Initial Appearance as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma held on 12/13/2024. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. Appointing Michael J Bresnehan with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Probable cause found as to the charges against the defendant and defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required (1) SPANISHI. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Megan Kelly for AUSA Diamond Zambrano for the Government, CJA Attorney CJA Michael Bresnehan for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. SPANISHI Interpreter Matt Ren assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:39 PM to 2:47 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus.(SMF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma: The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending further proceedings in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 12/13/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict by Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma. (Bresnehan, Michael) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 12/18/24. (EC) [2:24-mj-06433-ASB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 INFORMATION - Felony as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma (1) count(s) 1. (RMW)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma. (RMW)
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (RMW)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma. (RMW)
Related: [-]
13 13 IT IS ORDERED setting a change of plea hearing (30 mins) as to Aaron Gilberto Marquez-Palma for 1/28/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine.(DMF/ah)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]