Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01124
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 12:17 AM MST
Defendant
Angel Lopez-Carrera (1)
Material Witness
Material Witnesses
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ross Gabriel Arellano Edwards
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/25/2025 1:03 AM MST
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
Arrest of Angel Lopez-Carrera on 1/21/2025. (NM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Angel Lopez-Carrera. (NM)
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Angel Lopez-Carrera signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. (NM)
Related: [-]