New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00116
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 12:36 AM MST
Defendant
Tajahnae Maryann Johnson (2)
Represented By
Sarah M. Gorman
Law Offices Of Robert D. Gorman
contact info
Defendant
Roderick Norseweather, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Martin Juarez
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
George Rodriguez
contact info
Mindy Pirkovic
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Timothy Dale Trembley
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Patrick Cordova
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/25/2025 1:44 AM MST
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson (1). (nm) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr (1). (nm) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
Arrest of Tajahnae Maryann Johnson (khs) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson (khs) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Pirkovic, Mindy) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr (khs) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr (khs) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Rodriguez, George) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson: Initial Appearance set for 1/13/2025 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (khs) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr: Initial Appearance set for 1/13/2025 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (khs) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA Appointment of Attorney Sarah M. Gorman for Tajahnae Maryann Johnson by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (cl) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Martin Juarez for Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (khs) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
5 5 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Initial Appearance as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson held; Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom Related [+] (kd) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
5 5 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Initial Appearance as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr held; Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom Related [+] (kd) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
6 6 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
6 6 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention pending hearing as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention pending hearing as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
10 10 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson held Related [+] (kd) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
10 10 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr held Related [+] (kd) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Tajahnae Maryann Johnson by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [1:25-mj-00016-SCY]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [1:25-mj-00015-SCY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
Judge update in case as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr, Tajahnae Maryann Johnson. District Judge David H. Urias added. (khs)
Related: [-]
13 13 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Roderick Bill Noerseweather, Jr, Tajahnae Maryann Johnson. (khs)
Related: [-]