Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00169
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 1:24 AM CST
Defendant
Ricardo Rincon-Camacho (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 01/25/2025 2:15 AM CST
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Ricardo Rincon-Camacho (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 1/24/2025 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (clr5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Ricardo Rincon-Camacho, filed. (clr5)
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on January 23, 2025 at 12:10 PM as to Ricardo Rincon-Camacho. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (clr5)
Related: [-]