Mindy Nelson
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 8:25-bk-10203 |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2025 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 25, 2025 |
Debtor
Mindy Nelson, Debtor
3417 Calle La Veta
San Clemente, CA 92672-4855 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays Wood LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 01/25/2025 3:23 AM PST |
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 01/24 6:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-10203] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57954624. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals ; Mailing Matrix . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Mindy Nelson Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/7/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/7/2025. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/7/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/7/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/7/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/7/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/7/2025. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/7/2025. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/7/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/7/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/7/2025. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 02/7/2025. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 02/7/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 02/7/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 02/7/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 02/7/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 02/7/2025. (Hays, D) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Mindy Nelson. (Hays, D) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Mindy Nelson. (Hays, D) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Marshack (TR), Richard A with 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/25/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Marshack: Meeting ID 224 236 8893, Passcode 7892402221, Phone 1 657 222 4213. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |