Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00079
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Perle Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Gary Pluta
Mayer Brown Llp - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
Vision Sphere Labs, LLC
Represented By
Michael William Doell
Buether Joe & Counselors, LLC
contact info
Christopher Michael Joe
Buether Joe & Counselors, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/22 2:20 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned case is hereby STAYED for 30 days to allow the parties to file dismissal documents with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/20/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/22 4:28 PM
Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap has been CANCELLED Related [+]. (aeb)
Related: [-] fer to Dkt. No. 12
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 motion Stay Fri 04/18 3:49 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC.(Doell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stay
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/04 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/24 10:53 AM
ORDER granting8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Perle Systems, Inc. answer due 4/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/24/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/21 10:32 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Perle Systems, Inc..(Pluta, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gary Pluta on behalf of Perle Systems, Inc. (Pluta, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/19 4:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC. Perle Systems, Inc. served on 1/31/2025. (Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Perle Systems, Inc. c/o Minos Campbell. (NKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/27 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael William Doell on behalf of Vision Sphere Labs, LLC (Doell, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 01/27 1:43 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 01/27 1:34 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC (Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Perle Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10642079.), filed by Vision Sphere Labs, LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/27 11:47 AM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (KLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 01/27 11:48 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KLC)
Related: [-]