Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-03611

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:L Jefferson Davis IV
Case #: 2:25-ap-80005
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025

Debtor
Jacqueline Elizabeth Ard
239 Beach City Rd Unit 3218
Hilton Head, SC 29926
Represented By
Jacqueline Elizabeth Ard
contact info
Debtor
Terry Frank Nicola
663 William Hilton Pky Unit 4408
Hilton Head, SC 29928
Represented By
Terry Frank Nicola
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield
24810 Evergreen Road
Southfield, MI 48075
Represented By
Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Ard
239 Beach City Rd, No. 3218
Hilton Head Island, SC 29926
Represented By
Jacqueline Ard
contact info
Trustee
James M. Wyman
PO Box 997
Mount Pleasant, SC 29465


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
39 39 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 05/02 12:23 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 05/01/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Concerning Document - PDF Tue 04/29 9:19 AM
Order Concerning Document due to Failure to remit the fee for the USB in the amount of $34.00. Name Document: Request for Audio Recording. Filed By: Jacqueline Ard. Date Filed: 03/28/2025. Document Served. Related [+]. (Beaulieu, N)
Related: [-] 26
Monday, April 21, 2025
36 36 utility Returned Mail Processed (ADI) Mon 04/21 7:00 AM
Returned mail processed for the week beginning 04/14/2025 through 04/20/2025. (Admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
35 35 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sat 04/19 12:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/18/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
34 34 order Pre-Trial Scheduling Order Wed 04/16 3:36 PM
Scheduling Order. Motions to Join/Amend: 04/30/2025. Other Motions: 06/27/2025. Discovery: 06/13/2025. Objections: 07/07/2025. Document Served. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Order due by 7/7/2025. (Ting, K)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, April 13, 2025
33 33 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Mon 04/14 12:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/13/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32
Friday, April 11, 2025
32 32 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/11 3:42 PM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and Denying Counsel's Motion to Strike. Related [+], Denying Motion Document Served . (Barnello, P)Modified on 4/11/2025 to delete duplicate entries. (ns)
Related: [-] 9 15
Thursday, April 10, 2025
31 31 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 04/11 12:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
30 30 court Deficiency Notice (General) Tue 04/08 2:00 PM
Deficiency Notice re: Request for Audio Recording Related [+] Deficiency Correction Due By: 4/18/2025 **Failure to remit the fee for the USB in the amount of $34.00.** (Beaulieu, N)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 misc Adversary Proceeding Report Wed 04/02 1:41 PM
Adversary Proceeding Report Filed by Jacqueline Ard Related [+]. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-] 19
27 27 misc Adversary Proceeding Report Wed 04/02 10:01 AM
Adversary Proceeding Report Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield Related [+]. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, March 31, 2025
25 25 court Clerks Clerical Action Mon 03/31 12:06 PM
A clerical mistake was made in the entry of docket # 24. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9024, the document has been restricted and no further action will be taken. Related [+] (Stalvey, N)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 trans Request for Audio Recording Mon 03/31 12:09 PM
Request for Audio Recording in the format of CD. Hearing Date: 03/13/2025. 34.00 Filed by Jacqueline Ard . (Beaulieu, N)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 misc Request for Transcript Thu 03/27 2:16 PM
Request for Transcript of Hearing Held on 03/13/2025 Filed by Jacqueline Ard . (Beaulieu, N)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 15, 2025
20 20 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sun 03/16 12:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/15/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 order Complete Adversary Proceeding Report (order) Thu 03/13 1:12 PM
Initial Adversary Proceeding Case Management Order. Document Served. Monitor deadline: 4/3/2025 (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing Held Thu 03/13 11:28 AM
Hearing Held relating to: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield, Motion filed by Defendant Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. Related [+]. Motions are granted in part and denied in part. Order Due from Attorney Tara Nauful by 4/10/2025. (Beaulieu, N)
Related: [-] 9 ,15
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Thu 03/06 12:27 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/05/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 court Hearing (Document) Sched Mon 03/03 3:31 PM
Hearing scheduled relating to: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Notice required by SC LBR 7012-1. Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield., and Motion to Strike Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss with Certificate of Service. Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield Related [+]. Document Served . Hearing scheduled for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Charleston. The case judge is L Jefferson Davis, IV. (Beaulieu, N)
Related: [-] 14 9 ,15
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 motion Motion Thu 02/27 6:11 PM
Motion to Strike Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss with Certificate of Service. Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield Related [+]. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, February 24, 2025
14 14 answer Response Tue 02/25 9:11 AM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jacqueline Ard Related [+]. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-] 9
Sunday, February 23, 2025
12 12 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Mon 02/24 12:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 02/23/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/21 2:25 PM
Order Setting Deadline for Response to Motion to Dismiss Document Served Related [+]. (Barnello, P) Modified on 2/21/2025 to correct title (Barnello, P)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/19 11:56 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield, Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield Related [+]. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/19 11:55 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Notice required by SC LBR 7012-1. Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/19 11:47 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/12 9:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Tara E. Nauful of Best Law, P.A. on behalf of Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/10 1:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Tara E. Nauful of Best Law, P.A. on behalf of Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. (Nauful, Tara)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/03 12:20 PM
Certificate of Service RE: Summons Issued. Filed by Jacqueline Ard Related [+]. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 court Certificate of Mailing Tue 01/28 10:13 AM
Court Certificate of Mailing of re: Summons Issued Date Filed: 1/27/2025 Parties Served: Plaintiff via US Mail Related [+] (Barnello, P)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Mon 01/27 10:55 AM
Summons Issued on Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield Answer Due 2/26/2025 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 3:53 PM
Adversary case 25-80005 Complaint by Jacqueline Ard against Zeidman's Jewelry & Loan of Southfield. Core Proceeding. Fee is not due. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Barnello, P) Modified on 1/27/2025 to correct docket text re fee (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]