New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:25-cv-00451
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Costa DOE
Defendant
Lauro DOE
Defendant
King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc
Plaintiff
Benigno Lopez Martinez
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Michael Samuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/16 4:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc. (Kligman, Gregg)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph James Flanagan on behalf of King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc (aty to be noticed) (Flanagan, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg Marshall Kligman on behalf of King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc (aty to be noticed) (Kligman, Gregg)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Fugazy on behalf of King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc (aty to be noticed) (Fugazy, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Costa DOE, Lauro DOE, King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc. (IH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/27 2:01 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Benigno Lopez Martinez (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 01/27 1:51 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 01/27 1:49 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/27 1:36 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Benigno Lopez Martinez (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/27 1:35 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Benigno Lopez Martinez (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Costa DOE, Lauro DOE, King Souvlaki of Astoria Inc filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18704424 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Benigno Lopez Martinez. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/27 1:49 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 01/27 1:54 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name and address on the To Section and the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section are not correct. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]