Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00119
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Barry Carr
Defendant
Tim Fields
Defendant
Ignite Medical Resort Norman LLC
Defendant
Ignite Medical Resort Thrive LLC
Defendant
Ignite Medical Resorts Oklahoma LLC
Defendant
Ignite Oklahoma JV LLC
Defendant
Ignite V JV LLC
Defendant
Luxe Life Norman Al LLC
Defendant
Luxe Life Senior Living and Memory Care LLC
Defendant
Prestige Worldwide Luxe Life Norman LLC
Defendant
Prestige Worldwide Oklahoma LLC
Defendant
Prestige Worldwide Thrive LLC
Plaintiff
Mollie Wooldridge
Represented By
Jana Beth Leonard
Leonard & Associates PLLC
contact info
Shannon C Haupt
Leonard & Associates PLLC
contact info
Amanda Mayo Finch
Leonard And Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/16 1:45 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Obtain Service. Plaintiff is granted until August 25, 2025 to obtain service on Defendants. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 4/16/2025. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/15 1:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Service on Defendants by Mollie Wooldridge. (Leonard, Jana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/25 3:41 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amanda Mayo Finch removed as counsel of record for Plaintiff Mollie Wooldridge in this matter. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 3/25/2025. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/24 4:43 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mollie Wooldridge. (Finch, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 01/27 9:11 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Mollie Wooldridge (Haupt, Shannon)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 01/27 9:10 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda Mayo Finch on behalf of Mollie Wooldridge (Finch, Amanda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 01/27 9:08 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Mollie Wooldridge (Leonard, Jana)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 8:12 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Barry Carr, Tim Fields, Ignite Medical Resort Norman LLC, Ignite Medical Resort Thrive LLC, Ignite Medical Resorts Oklahoma LLC, Ignite Oklahoma JV LLC, Ignite V JV LLC, Luxe Life Norman Al LLC, Luxe Life Senior Living and Memory Care LLC, Prestige Worldwide Luxe Life Norman LLC, Prestige Worldwide Oklahoma LLC, Prestige Worldwide Thrive LLC. (naa)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Mon 01/27 8:44 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4615240. (Leonard, Jana)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 8:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Barry Carr, Tim Fields, Ignite Medical Resort Norman LLC, Ignite Medical Resort Thrive LLC, Ignite Medical Resorts Oklahoma LLC, Ignite Oklahoma JV LLC, Ignite V JV LLC, Luxe Life Norman Al LLC, Luxe Life Senior Living and Memory Care LLC, Prestige Worldwide Luxe Life Norman LLC, Prestige Worldwide Oklahoma LLC, Prestige Worldwide Thrive LLC filed by Mollie Wooldridge.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet