Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00080
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:27 AM CDT
Defendant
LCFC (Hefei) Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. d/b/a LC Future Center and Lenovo Compal Future Center
Defendant
Lenovo (Beijing) Limited
Defendant
Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Lenovo (Thailand) Limited
Defendant
Lenovo Centro Tecnolgico S. de R.L. de C.V.
Defendant
Lenovo Enterprise Technology Company Limited
Defendant
Lenovo Group Limited
Defendant
Lenovo Information Products (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.
Defendant
Lenovo NetApp Technology Limited
Defendant
Lenovo PC HK Ltd.
Defendant
Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited
Defendant
Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd.
Plaintiff
Key Patent Innovations Ltd.
Represented By
Alfred Ross Fabricant
Fabricant Llp - Ny
contact info
Vincent J Rubino, III
Fabricant Llp - Ny
contact info
Peter Lambrianakos
Fabricant LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Valtrus Innovations Ltd.
Represented By
Alfred Ross Fabricant
Fabricant Llp - Ny
contact info
Vincent J Rubino, III
Fabricant Llp - Ny
contact info
Peter Lambrianakos
Fabricant LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 01/28 3:07 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Lenovo (Thailand) Limited. (KLC)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 01/28 12:54 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to LCFC (Hefei) Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. d/b/a LC Future Center and Lenovo Compal Future Center, Lenovo (Beijing) Limited, Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co., Ltd., Lenovo Centro Tecnolgico S. de R.L. de C.V., Lenovo Enterprise Technology Company Limited, Lenovo Group Limited, Lenovo Information Products (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd., Lenovo NetApp Technology Limited, Lenovo PC HK Ltd., Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited, Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd..(NKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 3 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 4 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 5 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 6 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 7 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 8 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 9 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 10 Additional Attachment(s)
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/27 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Valtrus Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd. (Lambrianakos, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/27 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Valtrus Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd. (Fabricant, Alfred)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/27 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Valtrus Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd. (Rubino, Vincent)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 01/27 2:03 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Valtrus Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Key Patent Innovations Ltd. for Valtrus Innovations Ltd.; Corporate Parent New PP Licensing LLC for Key Patent Innovations Ltd.. (Rubino, Vincent)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 01/27 1:50 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent)
Related: [-]
1 1 83 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 1:45 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10642522.), filed by Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Valtrus Innovations Ltd..(Rubino, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/27 2:13 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 01/27 2:13 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]