Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:25-cv-00161
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-24-908550-C
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 4:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Key Insurance Company
Pyatt Silvestri 701 E. Bridger Ave. Suite 600
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
Philip Goodhart
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
April Reckling
Represented By
Jason F Lather
Lather Law
contact info
Sean D. Cooney
Cooney Forbush PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 minord Minute Order Mon 03/10 9:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/10/2025. By Deputy Clerk: Karen Walker. The parties are directed to file a status report within 90 days or by June 5, 2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Staying Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Mon 03/10 8:35 AM
ORDER granting12 Stipulation to Stay Case. Case is stayed until further order of this court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/7/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation Fri 03/07 11:11 AM
STIPULATION TO STAY CASE by Defendant Key Insurance Company.(Goodhart, Philip) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
11 11 minord Minute Order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/07 8:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/7/2025. The Stipulation to Stay Case for 90 Days (ECF No. 10 ) is denied without prejudice as the basis for the stay is not clear and the parties failed to attach the order they reference in the stipulation. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 motion Stipulation Thu 03/06 7:56 AM
First STIPULATION TO STAY CASE for 90 Days by Defendant Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 8 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 03/05 12:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/1/2025. Motions due by 10/1/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/5/2025. NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form has been sent to parties not receiving electronic service.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 03/03 11:17 AM
Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff April Reckling. (Cooney, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 misc Jury Demand Thu 02/06 1:50 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 4:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Key Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/13/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/20/2025.(Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 order Standing Order Wed 01/29 9:38 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 01/27 4:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/27/2025. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/11/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/26/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 01/27 1:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Key Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Med James, Inc. for Key Insurance Company added. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement in Removal Case Mon 01/27 1:06 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 01/27 1:04 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-908550-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7936972) by Key Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/6/2025. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 01/27 4:12 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMMi)
Related: [-]