Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Case #: 3:25-cv-00056
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 7:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Plaintiff
Riley Thornock
3017 Mountain Rd. PO Box 843
Glen Allen, VA 23060


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 motion Seal Mon 04/14 1:56 PM
MOTION to File Supporting Materials Under Seal by Riley Thornock. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1,
Att: 2 Sealed Attachment 1,
Att: 3 Sealed Attachment 2,
Att: 4 Sealed Attachment 3
9 9 motion Stay Mon 04/14 1:52 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Riley Thornock.(Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 04/14 1:49 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel due to Medical Impairment and Case Complexity by Riley Thornock.(Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (other) Fri 03/07 12:25 PM
Addendum to Plaintiff's Notice: The Church's Cultural Pattern of Shifting the Burden of Giving Onto the Needy by Riley Thornock(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Local Rule 83.1
6 6 notice Notice (other) Fri 03/07 12:21 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Recent Development Regarding Church Assistance and Request for Legal and Social Protections for Local Leadership by Riley Thornock(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Local Rule 83.1
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 03/07 12:17 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION Calling Attention to the Church's Legal Team's Mishandling of This Case, the Unfair Position it Placed on Local Leadership, and the Church's Pattern of Ignoring the Real-Time Emotional Needs of Those Who Serve It, by Riley Thornock.(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Local Rule 83.1
4 4 notice Notice (other) Fri 03/07 12:09 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of In Forma Pauperis Status Granted In Related Case and Request for Consistent Application in This Court.(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Local Rule 83.1,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit A
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 03/03 3:51 PM
MOTION to Expedite Ruling on IFP Status Due to Ongoing Systemic Retaliation and Due Process Violations by Riley Thornock.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Attachment,
Att: 2 1 pgs Local Rule 83.1
Thursday, February 06, 2025
2 2 5 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 02/07 1:20 PM
MOTION to Expedite Ruling on In Forma Pauperis Status by Riley Thornock. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/27 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Riley Thornock.(Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs "Motion for Fee Waiver Based on Financial Hardship and Systemic Inequities",
Att: 2 285 pgs Complaint, Received 1/27/25,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 5 10 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 6 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 1 pgs Local Rule 83.1(N),
Att: 8 2 pgs Proposed Summons
misc Docket Annotation Mon 01/27 3:58 PM
Additional Motions #2-15 and Motion for E-Noticing received. Placed in folder on shelf in Clerk's Office. (Kski, )
Related: [-]