Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:25-cv-00128
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Guardian Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By
Stephen H. Luther
Luther Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Guardian Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Justin Cunningham
Troutman Pepper Locke
contact info
Michael D. Hobbs, Jr.
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Brooke R Watson
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Di'Vennci K Lucas
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
32 32 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/03 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
31 31 misc Patent/Trademark Report Wed 04/02 3:44 PM
Trademark Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (LNR) (LNR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/2/2025) Copy of Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 11:58 AM
ORDER re 29 Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2025. (REG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of settlement Mon 03/31 4:58 PM
NOTICE of settlement (Joint) by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 03/24 12:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must respond to the Complaint by 3/31/2025. No further extensions of this deadline should be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/24/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 03/20 4:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer or responsive pleading by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 7:06 PM
NOTICE by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC re4 Interested Persons Order of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant (Luther, Stephen)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 5:44 PM
NOTICE by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC re4 Interested Persons Order of Pendency of Other Actions by Defendant (Luther, Stephen)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 5:40 PM
NOTICE by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC re4 Interested Persons Order of Designation of Lead Counsel for Defendant (Luther, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/11 3:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must respond to the Complaint by 3/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/11/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 03/10 6:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/03 2:29 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must respond to the Complaint by 3/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/3/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 1:56 PM
ORDER for attorneys Di'Vennci K Lucas and Brooke Watson to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/3/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
19 19 service Proof of service Fri 02/28 10:59 AM
RETURN of service executed on 1/30/2025 by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC as to Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) Modified text on 2/28/2025 (ABM)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Proof of service Fri 02/28 10:58 AM
RETURN of service executed on 1/30/2025 by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC as to Guardian Pharmacy, LLC.(Cunningham, Thomas) Modified text on 2/28/2025 (ABM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 02/27 5:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint or to Submit Other Response to Complaint by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Luther, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 02/12 5:25 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas Justin Cunningham on behalf of Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. Lead Counsel: Michael D. Hobbs. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 02/11 3:21 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. Related case(s): No (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/11 1:05 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/10 4:16 PM
NOTICE by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC of Pendency of Other Actions (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 02/10 4:13 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
11 11 order Standing Order Wed 02/05 1:45 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/30 10:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael D. Hobbs, Jr., Brooke R. Watson, and Di'Vennci Keron Lucas are granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/30/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 4:47 PM
MOTION for Di'Vennci Keron Lucas to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22964244 for $150 by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 4:22 PM
MOTION for Brooke R. Watson to appear pro hac vice Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22963662 for $150 by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 1/29/2025 to add receipt# (AJS)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 3:40 PM
MOTION for Michael D. Hobbs, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22963616 for $150 by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 misc Patent/Trademark Report Tue 01/28 2:30 PM
Trademark Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (LSS)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons issued Tue 01/28 1:00 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (LSS)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Tue 01/28 11:43 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/28/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/28 10:03 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brooke R. Watson, Di'Vennci K. Lucas and Michael D. Hobs, Jr.. Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/28 10:02 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:25-cv-128-PGB-DCI. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Guardian Pharmacy, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22954310) filed by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC d/b/a Guardian Pharmacy Services, an Indiana limited liability company.(Cunningham, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons