New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:25-cv-00755
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester Company, GLO-L-001635-24
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 6:21 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC DEFENDANTS 1-20
Defendant
LATESSIA GRICE
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK LYNCH
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC.
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK LYNCH
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
GXO LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK LYNCH
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
NYLA JOHNSON
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK LYNCH
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL RIZZO
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK LYNCH
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
FRANK WYCHINSKI
Represented By
SEAN PATRICK LYNCH
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-20
Plaintiff
JOHN ACCARDI
Represented By
WILLIAM JOSEPH MARTIN
Martin, Gunn & Martin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
22 22 order Order Wed 05/21 12:01 PM
TEXT ORDER: The in-person settlement conference on 5/29/2025 at 10:30 A.M. shall be, and is hereby, CONVERTED to a TELEPHONIC settlement conference. Clients with settlement authority shall be directed to be available via telephone. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988 / 489 081 987#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/21/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 05/20 8:35 AM
NOTICE: Settlement Memoranda due to Judge Donio's Chambers by 5/22/2025. See Scheduling Order dated 4/1/2025. Settlement Memoranda shall not be filed electronically. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
21 21 order Text Order Thu 05/15 3:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: A pre-motion conference on plaintiff's request to file a motion to remand (ECF No.17 ) will be held before District Judge Edward S. Kiel on June 10, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4D. Plaintiff's participation in the settlement conference scheduled for May 29, 2025 (ECF No.15 ) and pre-trial discovery shall not be considered a waiver of plaintiff's request to seek remand. So Ordered by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/15/2025.(gn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Wed 05/14 4:38 PM
Letter from Sean P. Lynch in response to Plaintiff's April 29, 2025 letter re17 Letter. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 9:39 AM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendants' request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter, until May 14. 2025. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/9/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Fri 05/09 11:18 AM
Letter from Defendants requesting extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Tue 04/29 2:27 PM
Letter from William Martin. (MARTIN, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 11:52 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Separate Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by FRANK WYCHINSKI.(LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/01 3:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/1/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/01 2:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 4/1/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 11:57 AM
ORDER Granting Defendant Wyshinski's Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/11/2025. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/31/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/31 11:37 AM
Proposed Order - Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Plan submitted on behalf of the parties by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC., FRANK WYCHINSKI. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/31 9:39 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The12 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by Frank Wyshinski on 3/28/2025 has been DENIED, because the requested extension is beyond what the Clerk can grant, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (mag)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 03/28 10:38 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Frank Wyshinski's response to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK LYNCH on behalf of FRANK WYCHINSKI (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 03/25 3:11 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC..(LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 order Order Tue 03/11 9:14 AM
TEXT ORDER: The in-person initial scheduling conference on 4/1/2025 at 10:30 A.M. shall be, and is hereby, CONVERTED to a TELEPHONIC initial scheduling conference. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-856-210-8988 / 640 148 329#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/11/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Wed 02/19 9:25 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 02/19/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/18 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC..(LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 01/28 5:16 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by JOHN ACCARDI. (MARTIN, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 01/28 5:06 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC.. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 01/28 2:33 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (aji, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 01/28 2:33 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 01/28 3:22 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The4 Application for Clerk's Order to Extending Time to Answer submitted by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 02/18/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 01/27 5:39 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Mon 01/27 5:34 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC.. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 01/27 5:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC.. (LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/27 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County, case number GLO-L-001635-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15972705), filed by GXO LOGISTICS SUPPLY CHAIN, INC..(LYNCH, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A through Exhibit D,
Att: 2 Certification - Rule 11.2,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/28 2:10 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
Related: [-]