Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 6:25-cv-00135
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 4:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Mandala Journey Works LLC
Plaintiff
Lynne Silva
Represented By
Michael R. Fuller
Underdog Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 order Dismissal - Case Fri 02/14 10:02 AM
Order Dismissing Case: This case is dismissed on the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal4 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
4 4 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Thu 02/13 12:01 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Lynne Silva. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 1:16 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Mandala Journey Works LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 01/27 1:10 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/27/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/26/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 6/26/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 12:22 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9724146 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Lynne Silva against Mandala Journey Works LLC. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons