Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Case #: 3:25-cv-00207
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 6:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Karat Packaging Inc
Defendant
Lollicup USA Inc
Plaintiff
Huhtamaki Inc
Represented By
Samantha Sweet
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Buffey E Klein
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Michael R Annis
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 respm Reply Fri 04/25 1:03 PM
REPLY filed by Karat Packaging Inc, Lollicup USA Inc re:19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Amin, Ismail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix
Thursday, April 24, 2025
26 26 respm Reply Thu 04/24 6:37 PM
REPLY filed by Karat Packaging Inc, Lollicup USA Inc re:18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(b) (Amin, Ismail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 respm Appendix in Support Fri 04/11 5:44 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Huhtamaki Inc re24 Response/Objection (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response/Objection Fri 04/11 5:43 PM
RESPONSE filed by Huhtamaki Inc re:18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(b) (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
23 23 respm Appendix in Support Fri 04/04 10:30 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Huhtamaki Inc re22 Response/Objection (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response/Objection Fri 04/04 10:27 PM
RESPONSE filed by Huhtamaki Inc re:19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
21 21 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 03/14 8:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Karat Packaging Inc, Lollicup USA Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Amin, Ismail)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Appendix in Support Fri 03/14 8:34 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Karat Packaging Inc, Lollicup USA Inc re19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Amin, Ismail)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Transfer Case Out of District/Division Fri 03/14 8:30 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Lollicup USA Inc, Karat Packaging Inc (Amin, Ismail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
18 18 motion Dismiss Fri 03/14 7:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(b) filed by Karat Packaging Inc, Lollicup USA Inc (Amin, Ismail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Thu 03/06 11:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lollicup USA Inc ; served on 3/4/2025. (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/05 2:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFF HUHTAMAKI, INC.'S AND DEFENDANTS LOLLICUP USA INC. AND KARAT PACKAGING INC.'S JOINT, UNOPPOSED13 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONDING TO HUHTAMAKI'S COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: deadline for Defendants' response to Huhtamaki's Complaint is extended fifteen days, to 3/14/2025. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/5/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 10:04 AM
Summons Reissued as to Lollicup USA Inc. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
14 14 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 02/28 3:40 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Huhtamaki Inc. (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/27 4:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time Respond to Complaint filed by Huhtamaki Inc (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Wed 02/12 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lollicup USA Inc ; served on 2/6/2025. (Annis, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Wed 02/12 3:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Karat Packaging Inc ; served on 2/6/2025. (Annis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/31 10:45 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samantha R. Sweet. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 1/31/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/31 10:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Annis. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 1/31/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Fri 01/31 12:10 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD CLOSURE/ENTERED IN ERROR***Civil Case Terminated per 201 Stipulation of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (ykp) Modified on 1/31/2025 (ykp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 11:01 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15222508) filed by Huhtamaki IncAttorney Samantha Sweet added to party Huhtamaki Inc(pty:pla) (Sweet, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 10:52 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15222444) filed by Huhtamaki IncAttorney Michael R Annis added to party Huhtamaki Inc(pty:pla) (Annis, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 01/28 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Karat Packaging Inc, Lollicup USA Inc. (kcr)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Tue 01/28 10:33 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 qcref Godbey Tue 01/28 10:31 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 01/27 3:54 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s)
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 01/27 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Karat Packaging Inc., Lollicup USA Inc. filed by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15216771) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Klein, Buffey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 5 AO120