New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:25-cv-00457
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
NY District Director Tamika Gray
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services 26 Federal Plaza
New York, NY 10278
Represented By
Varuni Nelson
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Gui An Qiu
348 56th Street, Apt 1
Brooklyn, NY 11220
Represented By
Vlad A. Kuzmin
Kuzmin Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/27 5:37 PM
Civil Case Terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 2/27/2025. (MED)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/21 11:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Tamika Gray (Nelson, Varuni)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/10 4:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gui An Qiu. Tamika Gray served on 1/30/2025, answer due 2/20/2025. (Kuzmin, Vlad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Varuni Nelson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Nelson, Varuni)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 01/27 5:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Tamika Gray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 01/27 5:35 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 01/27 5:34 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/27 5:22 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Gui An Qiu (Kuzmin, Vlad)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/27 5:22 PM
Proposed Summons. by Gui An Qiu (Kuzmin, Vlad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT in the nature of mandamus against Tamika Gray filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18706221 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gui An Qiu. (Kuzmin, Vlad)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/27 5:32 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]