Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:25-cv-00247
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2024-037703
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 2:24 AM MST
Defendant
Lyft Incorporated
Represented By
Bradley David Shwer
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
Ryan Shawn Patterson
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
Matthew Tyler St Martin
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
Defendant
Flexdrive Services LLC
Plaintiff
Timothy Meyer
4800 W Ocotillo Rd., Ste. 91
Glendale, AZ 85301
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lyft Express Drive
Terminated: 02/19/2025

GPO Feb 24 2025
ORDER that Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Remand to State Court is denied. Signed by Judge Dominic W. Lanza on 2/24/2025. (ESG) (ESG).
GPO Mar 24 2025
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to strike 22 and request for appointment of counsel 27 are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss 25 is granted. The FAC 15 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint by April 11, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by April 11, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/24/2025. (KLG)
GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion 30 is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the second amended complaint is extended to May 16, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by May 16, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/17/2025. (KLG)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, April 17, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 12:57 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion30 is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the second amended complaint is extended to May 16, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by May 16, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/17/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/17 10:29 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Timothy Meyer. (12 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
32 32 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/15 2:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Amended Claim filed by Lyft Incorporated. (St Martin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
31 31 misc Supplement Mon 04/14 2:41 PM
SUPPLEMENT re:30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Timothy Meyer. (1 Page) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to Amend Sun 04/13 8:09 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by Timothy Meyer. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
29 29 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/24 12:29 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to strike22 and request for appointment of counsel27 are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss25 is granted. The FAC15 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint by April 11, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by April 11, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/24/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Reply Mon 03/24 11:55 AM
REPLY re:25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ; Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion by Defendant Lyft Incorporated. (St Martin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 03/20 8:53 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Timothy Meyer. (3 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/20 8:52 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Timothy Meyer. (4 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/10 12:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Lyft Incorporated.(St Martin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Dft Lyft, Inc.'s Certification Pursuant to LR 12.1(c)
Friday, March 07, 2025
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/07 9:58 AM
ORDER - "A district court lacks the power to act as a party's lawyer, even for pro se litigants." Bias v. Moynihan , 508 F.3d 1212, 1219 (9th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for clarification (Doc.21 ) is denied. Plaintiff is reminded that the Court has a free clinic available to provide legal advice. (Doc.3 at 6.) Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/7/25. (SLQ)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 3 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 03/06 3:19 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:22 MOTION to Strike5 Disclosure Statement filed by Lyft Incorporated. (St Martin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 motion Strike Thu 03/06 10:36 AM
MOTION to Strike5 Disclosure Statement by Timothy Meyer. (10 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/06 10:34 AM
MOTION for Clarification or Determination on Service of Process by Timothy Meyer. (1 Page) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 02/24 1:08 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's12 Motion to Remand to State Court is denied. Signed by Judge Dominic W. Lanza on 2/24/2025. (ESG) (ESG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing Fri 02/21 4:23 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/21/25. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/21 3:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Timothy Meyer. (1 Page) (KLG)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Allow Electronic Filing Fri 02/21 1:58 PM
MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Timothy Meyer. (7 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
16 16 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/20 4:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Lyft Incorporated. (St Martin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/19 9:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Flexdrive Services LLC, Lyft Incorporated filed by Timothy Meyer. (6 Pages)(KLG)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/19 9:54 AM
ORDER that the Clerk file the amended complaint, which is currently lodged at Doc.9 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the original complaint7 is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Lyft to respond to the amended complaint is extended to 14 days after the Court's resolution of the motion to remand. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/19/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/13 4:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lyft Incorporated. (St Martin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 motion Remand to State Court Wed 02/12 2:07 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Timothy Meyer. (2 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response to Motion Wed 02/12 2:05 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy Meyer. (2 Pages) (KLG)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 02/12 10:21 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend as a matter of course8 is denied as moot. Plaintiff may file his amended complaint as a matter of course within the timeframe provided by Rule 15(a)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent the motion at Doc.8 could be construed as a motion for remand, the motion is denied without prejudice as premature because the amended complaint has not yet been filed. Any renewed motion, following the filing of an amended complaint, shall include arguments and law in favor of granting relief and shall indicate that the parties conferred and could not reach an agreement regarding remand. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/11/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 respoth Lodged Proposed Document Tue 02/11 3:02 PM
LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint re:8 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Timothy Meyer. (KLG)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Tue 02/11 2:59 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Timothy Meyer. (1 Page) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Case Mon 02/03 1:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Lyft Incorporated.(Patterson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. 1- Dft Lyft, Inc.'s Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1(C)
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/29 11:34 AM
PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that unless the Court orders otherwise, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 90 days of filing the complaint. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/29/2025. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 01/27 5:06 PM
Disclosure Statement by Lyft Incorporated. (Patterson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Mon 01/27 4:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Lyft Incorporated. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Mon 01/27 4:15 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Mon 01/27 4:14 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23914747. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00247 PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 01/27 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-037703. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23914747 filed by Lyft Incorporated. (submitted by Ryan Patterson)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
***State Court record received on 1/27/2025***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Meyer: Notice of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Attachment(s), and Certificate(s) upon Lyft Incorporated via C T Corporation System on 1/07/2025.***Service of Process Transmittal Summary docketed in U.S. District Court on 1/27/2025 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Mon 01/27 4:13 PM
***State Court record received on 1/27/2025***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Meyer: Notice of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Attachment(s), and Certificate(s) upon Lyft Incorporated via C T Corporation System on 1/07/2025.***Service of Process Transmittal Summary docketed in U.S. District Court on 1/27/2025 for case management purposes.*** (REK)
Related: [-]