Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:25-cv-05065
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Thurston County Superior Court, 25-00002-00288-34
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 3:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Pierce County
Represented By
Elizabeth Anne Dasse
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office (civil)
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Benedict
E-Filing/Service 453 S SPRING ST, SUITE 400 PMB 1501
LOS ANGELES, CA 90013


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
33 33 order Judgment by Court Wed 04/09 4:38 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Benedict has failed to state a plausible claim against Pierce County. The County's motion to dismiss, Dkt.6 , is GRANTED. Because Benedict could not amend her complaint to cure any of the fatal defects described in the previous Order, the dismissal is with prejudice and without leave to amend. This case is closed. (MW)
Related: [-]
32 32 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 04/09 4:30 PM
ORDER granting Pierce County's6 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's9 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot Plaintiff's15 Motion for Sanctions, Spoliation, Monell Liability, and Expedited Discovery; and27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk shall enter a JUDGMENT and close the case. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice-Other Wed 04/09 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Deposition re 30 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Set/Clear Flags,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,29 Notice-Other ; filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Protective Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/09 12:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Pierce County's motion to stay discovery pending resolution of its motion to dismiss, Dkt.8 , and its related motion for a protective order precluding depositions and other discovery until the Court rules on the motion to dismiss, Dkt.26 , are GRANTED. All discovery and all pretrial deadlines are suspended pending further Court Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice-Other Wed 04/09 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ; filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
28 28 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/07 9:52 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Heather Benedict, to26 MOTION for Protective Order . (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 06, 2025
27 27 motion Preliminary Injunction Sun 04/06 8:08 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. Noting Date 4/7/2025, (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A through I (Total of 126 pages)
Friday, April 04, 2025
26 26 motion Protective Order Fri 04/04 1:30 PM
MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant Pierce County. Noting Date 4/18/2025, (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
25 25 misc Jury Demand Wed 04/02 2:43 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Heather Benedict (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 04/02 12:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pierce County on 2/27/2025, filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice-Other Wed 04/02 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION re5 Discovery, Depositions, and Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges, ; filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/28 12:51 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict, TO RESPONSE to15 MOTION for Sanctions Spoliation, Monell Liability, and Expedited Discovery(Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/26 12:54 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict, TO RESPONSE to9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion and Motion to Stay Discovery re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,8 MOTION to Stay (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/25 11:31 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Pierce County, to15 MOTION for Sanctions Spoliation, Monell Liability, and Expedited Discovery . (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
19 19 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/18 11:17 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Pierce County, to9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion and Motion to Stay Discovery re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,8 MOTION to Stay . (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 respm Surreply Wed 03/12 2:18 PM
SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,8 MOTION to Stay Notice of Supplemental Authorities(Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/12 12:09 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Pierce County, TO RESPONSE to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 discov Disclosure of Expert Witnesses Mon 03/10 11:46 AM
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES Filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict.(Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Sanctions Mon 03/10 12:36 AM
MOTION for Sanctions Spoliation, Monell Liability, and Expedited Discovery , filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. Noting Date 3/28/2025, (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A through K,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Consideration Noted for March 28, 2025
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
14 14 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/05 8:25 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Heather Benedict, to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument Requested. (Benedict, Heather)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Wed 03/05 4:26 PM
NOTICE: Plaintiff Heather Benedict has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/05 2:26 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Pierce County, TO RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Stay (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
11 11 respm Declaration Tue 03/04 1:19 PM
DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict re8 MOTION to Stay. (MW)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/04 1:18 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Heather Benedict, to8 MOTION to Stay. (MW)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/04 1:18 PM
MOTION to Strike Defendants'6 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion and8 Motion to Stay Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Heather Benedict. Noted by Clerk for 3/25/2025. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 motion Stay Wed 02/12 3:58 PM
MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Pierce County. Noting Date 3/5/2025, (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 respm Declaration Wed 02/12 3:56 PM
DECLARATION of Elizabeth Dasse in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pierce County re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/12 3:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant Pierce County. Noting Date 3/12/2025, (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Wed 01/29 9:07 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/15/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/22/2025, Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/28 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Defendants Pierce County, Does 1-10. (Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 01/28 11:16 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 01/28 11:14 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/28 11:12 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 01/27 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 25 2-00288 34; Related [+] Attorney Elizabeth Anne Dasse added to party County Pierce(pty:dft) filed by County Pierce.(Dasse, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8815505
Att: 1 Exhibit COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Exhibit SUMMONS,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Appearance