District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:25-cv-00234
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
1900 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20415
Represented By
Olivia Grace Horton
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth J. Shapiro
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Andrew Marshall Bernie
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 1
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 2
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 3
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 4
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 5
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 6
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE, 7
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info

GPO Feb 17 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons explained herein, Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. 15, is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2025. (lcrdm2)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
40 40 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/15 12:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to38 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Discovery , in the Alternative, by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/15 12:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, Dkt.40 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class, Dkt.38 , on or before May 27, 2025. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
39 39 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/07 3:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to38 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Discovery , in the Alternative, by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/07 4:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, Dkt.39 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant may file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class, Dkt.38 , on or before May 19, 2025. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/7/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
38 38 motion Certify Class Discovery Sun 04/27 10:05 PM
MOTION to Certify Class , MOTION for Discovery , in the Alternative, by JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 17, 2025
37 37 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Mon 03/17 2:50 PM
RESPONSE re36 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 03/17 3:30 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7 (McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Sun 03/16 5:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply, Dkt.35 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the surreply DEEMED FILED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/16/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
35 35 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/12 11:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed sur-reply,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
34 34 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 03/12 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT Substituting for attorney Olivia Horton (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 03/12 2:41 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of All Defendants (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 03/07 11:10 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re28 Motion for Sanctions filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Feb. 6 transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Feb. 14 transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - NSC v. CIA transcript
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
30 30 13 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 03/06 12:00 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re17 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 28, 2025
29 29 respm Response to motion Fri 02/28 7:02 PM
RESPONSE re28 MOTION for Sanctions filed by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Sanctions Fri 02/28 6:00 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/26 6:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/26 11:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Safe Harbor Period, Dkt.23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED as unopposed. Plaintiffs may file or present the relevant motion to the Court after 6:00 p.m. on Friday, February 28, 2025. Plaintiffs, in their reply brief, suggested that the Court should shorten the safe harbor period even further, but a reply brief is not an appropriate vehicle by which to make a new request for a different timeline. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/26 7:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, Dkt.27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file an opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before March 5, 2025. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to (non-motion) Document Tue 02/25 5:30 PM
REPLY re23 MOTION to Shorten Safe Harbor Period filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7. (McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response to Order of the Court Tue 02/25 3:23 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re23 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT filed by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Horton, Olivia) Modified on 2/27/2025 to correct event/docket text (zjm).
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Transcript Tue 02/25 2:40 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 2/14/25; Page Numbers: 1-41. Date of Issuance:2/25/25. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay, Telephone number 202-354-3053, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/18/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2025.(stl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
23 23 3 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/24 2:42 PM
MOTION to Shorten Safe Harbor Period by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/24 5:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendant is hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Safe Harbor Period, Dkt.23 , on or before February 25, 2025, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/24/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
21 21 15 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 02/17 11:38 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons explained herein, Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt.15 , is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Sat 02/15 3:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a sealed ex parte declaration containing the real names and residential addresses of Jane Does 3-7 before 5:00 p.m. tomorrow, February 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/15/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
19 19 misc Transcript Fri 02/14 3:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 2/6/25; Page Numbers: 1-44. Date of Issuance:2/14/25. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay, Telephone number 202-354-3053, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/7/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2025.(stl)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Fri 02/14 5:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2025 re15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 7, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 2. Oral argument heard. Matter taken under advisement. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay. (zglw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 02/13 2:01 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 Motion for TRO filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE, 5, JANE DOE, 7. (McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 2 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 02/11 8:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Horton, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 02/11 8:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Horton, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 26 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Sat 02/08 12:07 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/07 8:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JANE DOE, 2, JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE, 3, JANE DOE, 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 7.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint (redlined)
13 13 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 02/07 7:28 PM
ORDER: For the reasons contained herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to add pseudonymous plaintiffs to their amended complaint, Dkt.12 , is GRANTED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/7/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Fri 02/07 2:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Add Pseudonymous Plaintiffs to Amended Complaint in Violation of LCvR 5.1(c) (On Which Defendant Takes No Position) by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2.(McClanahan, Kelly) Modified on 2/7/2025 to correct relief (zjm).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2d McClanahan declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/06 12:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2025 re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2. For the reasons stated on the record the motion is denied. Order to follow. Plaintiff to file Motion on or before 2/7/2025. Defendant to file it's response on or before 2/11/2025. Plaintiff to file Reply on or before 2/13/2025. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay) (zglw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for TRO Thu 02/13 1:36 PM
For the reasons stated on the record at the 2/6/25 Hearing the4 Motion for TRO is terminated as DENIED. (zglw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
11 11 2 pgs misc Errata Wed 02/05 8:40 PM
ERRATA by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT re10 Response to motion.(Horton, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
10 10 11 pgs respm Response to motion Wed 02/05 10:01 AM
RESPONSE re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Horton, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/05 11:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Because Plaintiffs' counsel failed to appear for today's status conference (and apparently assumed that the status conference would take place by Zoom), today's proceeding is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for tomorrow, February 6, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Members of the public may access the proceeding via telephone using the following information: Toll Free Number 833-990-9400; Meeting ID: 043781081. The parties should be prepared to address Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order on the merits and to address scheduling for any further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/5/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 9 pgs order .Order Tue 02/04 7:35 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/4/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 02/04 5:35 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/04 5:18 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs'3 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms is GRANTED, subject to any further consideration by the United States District Judge to whom this case is randomly assigned; 2) All parties shall use the pseudonyms listed in the Complaint in all documents filed in this action; and 3) Within fourteen days of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file on the public docket: i) A pseudonymous version of their3 Motion and any attachments; and ii) A sealed ex parte declaration containing their real names and residential addresses. Signed by Chief Judge Boasberg on February 4, 2025. (lcjeb3)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Grace Horton on behalf of OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Horton, Olivia)
Related: [-]
4 4 22 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 02/04 9:17 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that counsel for Plaintiffs shall appear via Zoom for a hearing on the Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously on February 4, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on February 4, 2025. (lcjeb3)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that counsel for Plaintiffs shall appear via Zoom for a hearing on the Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously on February 4, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. The public may access this hearing by listening to the broadcast of the hearing in Courtroom 22A or by calling 833-990-9400 and using Meeting ID 049550816. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/2025 (lcjeb3) Modified to add public access line on 2/4/2025 (znbn).
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/04 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held via Zoom (public access line connected) on 2/4/2025 re2 SEALED MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2. Oral discussions heard; motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (znbn)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/04 5:32 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsl)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/04 7:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order, Dkt.4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on February 5, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/4/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/04 10:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that counsel for Plaintiffs shall appear via Zoom for a hearing on the Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously on February 4, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. The public may access this hearing by listening to the broadcast of the hearing in Courtroom 22A or by calling 833-990-9400 and using Meeting ID 049550816. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/2025 (lcjeb3) Modified to add public access line on 2/4/2025 (znbn)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order, Dkt.4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on February 5, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 and by telephone for members of the public. Toll Free Number 833-990-9400; Meeting ID: 043781081. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/4/2025. (lcrdm2) Modified on 2/5/2025 to include public line information (zglw).
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
3 3 4 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/30 12:53 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using "Jane Does 1-2" in Violation of LCvR 5.1(c) re1 Complaint, by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - McClanahan declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/29 4:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs'2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it does not address the five-factor inquiry that applies to such motions, see In re Sealed Case , 971 F.3d 324, 326-27 (D.C. Cir. 2020); 2) Within fourteen days of the Court's Order, Plaintiffs shall file either a new Motion that addresses the factors identified in In re Sealed Case or a Notice advising the Clerk of the Court whether they wish to proceed under their true names, and, if so, they shall also file their2 Motion on the public docket; and 3) If Plaintiffs do not file a new Motion or such Notice within fourteen days, the Clerk is directed to terminate the case. The factors identified in In re Sealed Case are:1 whether the justification asserted by the requesting party is merely to avoid the annoyance and criticism that may attend any litigation or is to preserve privacy in a matter of a sensitive and highly personal nature;2 whether identification poses a risk of retaliatory physical or mental harm to the requesting party or, even more critically, to innocent non-parties; 3 the ages of the persons whose privacy interests are sought to be protected; 4 whether the action is against a governmental or private party; and, relatedly, 5 the risk of unfairness to the opposing party from allowing an action against it to proceed anonymously. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/29/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs'2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it does not address the five-factor inquiry that applies to such motions, see In re Sealed Case , 971 F.3d 324, 326-27 (D.C. Cir. 2020); 2) Within fourteen days of the Court's Order, Plaintiffs shall file either a new Motion that addresses the factors identified in In re Sealed Case or a Notice advising the Clerk of the Court whether they wish to proceed under their true names, and, if so, they shall also file their2 Motion on the public docket; and 3) If Plaintiffs do not file a new Motion or such Notice within fourteen days, the Clerk is directed to terminate the case. The factors identified in In re Sealed Case are:1 whether the justification asserted by the requesting party is merely to avoid the annoyance and criticism that may attend any litigation or is to preserve privacy in a matter of a sensitive and highly personal nature;2 whether identification poses a risk of retaliatory physical or mental harm to the requesting party or, even more critically, to innocent non-parties;3 the ages of the persons whose privacy interests are sought to be protected; 4 whether the action is against a governmental or private party; and, relatedly, 5 the risk of unfairness to the opposing party from allowing an action against it to proceed anonymously. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/29/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs'2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it does not address the five-factor inquiry that applies to such motions, see In re Sealed Case , 971 F.3d 324, 326-27 (D.C. Cir. 2020); 2) Within fourteen days of the Court's Order, Plaintiffs shall file either a new Motion that addresses the factors identified in In re Sealed Case or a Notice advising the Clerk of the Court whether they wish to proceed under their true names, and, if so, they shall also file their2 Motion on the public docket; and 3) If Plaintiffs do not file a new Motion or such Notice within fourteen days, the Clerk is directed to terminate the case. The factors identified in In re Sealed Case are:1 whether the justification asserted by the requesting party is merely to avoid the annoyance and criticism that may attend any litigation or is to preserve privacy in a matter of a sensitive and highly personal nature;2 whether identification poses a risk of retaliatory physical or mental harm to the requesting party or, even more critically, to innocent non-parties;3 the ages of the persons whose privacy interests are sought to be protected;4 whether the action is against a governmental or private party; and, relatedly, 5 the risk of unfairness to the opposing party from allowing an action against it to proceed anonymously. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/29/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
2 2 2 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/28 9:50 AM
MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2.(McClanahan, Kelly) Modified on 1/29/2025 to correct event type and docket entry text (zsl).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - McClanahan declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Error- New Case Tue 01/28 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. Other - No Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is filed. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 9:52 PM
COMPLAINT (Class Action) against OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11436090) filed by JANE DOE, 1, JANE DOE, 2.(McClanahan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons