New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:25-cv-00762
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 13, 2025 6:22 AM EDT
Defendant
MARY E MCCOY
Represented By
JAMI BETH NIMEROFF
Brown Nimeroff LLC
contact info
MARY KAY BROWN
Brown, Nimeroff, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TCA LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By
NOELLE TORRICE
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Arnoff
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
28 28 order Order Tue 03/04 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court has reviewed the parties' letters filed February 28, 2025 (ECF No.26 ) and March 3, 2025 (ECF No.27 ) regarding Defendant Mary McCoy ("Defendant") request for clarification of the Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") entered February 14, 2025. The Court notes that on February 27, 2025, before Defendant's Letter was filed, Plaintiff TCA Logistics, LLC ("Plaintiff") filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Additionally, the TRO in this matter expired on February 28, 2025. As this case has been voluntarily dismissed (ECF No.27 ), this Court does not have jurisdiction to render an advisory opinion on the issues raised in Defendant's letter, Defendant's request (ECF No.26 ) is dismissed as moot. See, e.g., Chafin v. Chafin, 568 U.S. 165, 172 (2013); Lutter v. JNESO, 86 F. 4th 111, 123, 124 n.7 (3d Cir. 2023). So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 3/4/2025. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (4m, 41.1) Mon 03/03 3:12 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 3/3/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
26 26 misc Letter Fri 02/28 12:56 PM
Letter from Noelle B. Torrice to Judge Neals re25 Letter. (TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Thu 02/27 12:31 PM
Letter from Mary Kay Brown, Esquire to The Honorable Julien Xavier Neals. (BROWN, MARY)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Thu 02/27 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC (TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
23 23 order Order Thu 02/20 4:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the letter from defense counsel stating that Plaintiff intends to dismiss the case on or before 2/28/25, (ECF No.22 ), the telephone conference on 2/21/25 at 12pm is CANCELLED. The parties shall submit either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report letter on or before 2/28/25. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/20/2025. (tjd)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Letter Thu 02/20 4:07 PM
Letter from Mary Kay Brown, Esquire to The Honorable Julien Xavier Neals. (BROWN, MARY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
21 21 order Text Order Fri 02/14 1:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a conference before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 2/21/25 at 12 p.m. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. The Court will discuss scheduling for Plaintiff's expedited discovery requests on the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/14/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Fri 02/14 9:05 AM
ORDER granting7 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; granting2 TCA's Motion for expedited discovery. TCA shall submit a reply brief on its motion for a preliminary injunction on or by 2/20/2025. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 2/13/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 order Order Tue 02/11 3:32 PM
TEXT ORDER - As provided on the record during Oral Argument on February 11, 2024, on or before February 12, 2024, the Court will issue a written opinion on the pending motions. So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 2/11/2025. (kd)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/11 10:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Julien Xavier Neals: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2025 re3 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Held (Court Reporter, Melissa Mormile (973-776-7710)) (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 misc Affidavit Mon 02/10 11:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Victor Mraz by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC. (TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/10 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMI BETH NIMEROFF on behalf of MARY E MCCOY (NIMEROFF, JAMI)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Brief Mon 02/10 2:57 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Restraining Order(BROWN, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mary E. McCoy,
Att: 2 Declaration of Rob Davis,
Att: 3 Declaration of Coleen Jones Regarding Email Searches,
Att: 4 Declaration of Coleen Jones Regarding Internet Searches,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 10:25 AM
ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to SARAH J. SCHNEIDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/7/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 10:17 AM
ORDER granting11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JAQUAN S. WILLIAMS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/7/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/07 8:54 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jaquan S. Williams ,12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah J. Schneider . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 5:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah J. Schneider by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC.(TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Motion
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 5:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jaquan S. Williams by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC.(TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Motion
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 3:31 PM
ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. SCOTT HUMPHREY, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/6/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Scott Humphrey by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC.(TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Motion
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/06 2:07 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Scott Humphrey . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/05 12:02 PM
TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff TCA Logistics, LLC's ("Plaintiff") applications for Temporary Restraints and Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Mary E. McCoy ("Defendant"). (ECF Nos.3 ,7 .) The Court will conduct a hearing on Tuesday February 11, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall be prepared to present grounds for the issuance of a temporary restraining order. So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 2/5/2025. (kd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 misc Letter Fri 01/31 2:47 PM
Letter from Noelle B. Torrice requesting a Temporary Restraining Order.(TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 misc Affidavit Thu 01/30 10:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC. (TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 2:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARY E MCCOY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/29 8:37 AM
Set Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Expedite / for Expedited Discovery . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 01/29 9:04 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 01/28 8:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC identifying Diverse Logistics Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/28 12:07 PM
Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/28 2:45 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 01/27 9:35 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum in Support - Oral Argument Requested by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC. (TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Expedite Mon 01/27 9:30 PM
MOTION to Expedite / for Expedited Discovery by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC.(TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - TCA's Proposed Expedited Discovery Requests,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 9:01 PM
COMPLAINT against MARY E MCCOY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15973189) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TCA LOGISTICS, LLC.(TORRICE, NOELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - McCoy Employment Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Employment Agreement Email,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet