South Carolina District Court
Judge:Cameron Mcgowan Currie
Referred: Shiva V Hodges
Case #: 3:25-cv-00513
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr (Other)
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 misc Document Mailed Thu 04/03 8:16 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:18 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation,19 Judgment, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Patrick Williams Lexington County Detention Center 521 Gibson Rd. Lexington, SC 29072 (cpri )
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Judgment Thu 04/03 8:13 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice. (cpri )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation Thu 04/03 8:08 AM
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting the Report and Recommendation [ECF No. 13 ] and dismissing this action without prejudice and without leave for further amendment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/2/2025. (cpri )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
15 15 misc Document Mailed Fri 03/07 2:15 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 12 Text Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Patrick Williams at 1129 PineLake Rd. Marion, SC 29571 per envelope re 10 -2 out of precaution. (cpri )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Document Mailed Fri 03/07 2:07 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 12 Text Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Patrick Williams Lexington County Detention Center 521 Gibson Rd. Lexington, SC 29072. (cpri)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 03/07 2:05 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be summarily dismissed without leave for further amendment. Objections to R&R due by 3/21/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 03/07/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/07 2:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff applied to proceed in the District Court without prepaying fees or costs. [ECF No. 9 ]. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the court construes this application as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915 . A review of the motion reveals that Plaintiff should be relieved of the obligation to prepay the full filing fee. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, subject to the court's right to require a payment if Plaintiff's financial condition changes, and to tax fees and costs against Plaintiff at the conclusion of this case if the court finds the case to be without merit. See Flint v. Haynes , 651 F.2d 970, 972-74 (4th Cir. 1981). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 03/07/2025. (cpri )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/26 2:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Patrick Williams. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (cpri)
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Financial Certificate,
Att: 2 Envelope,
Att: 3 Envelope
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/26 2:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Patrick Williams against Jordan Cox, J. Meeks, L/CPL Woods. (cpri )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 misc Document Mailed Mon 02/03 11:27 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:4 Proper Form Order,5 Order and Notice, one standard complaint form, one Summons, four forms USM-285, Form AO-240 and a Financial Certificate form, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Patrick Williams Lexington County Detention Center 521 Gibson Rd. Lexington, SC 29072. (cpri)
Related: [-]
5 5 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/03 11:25 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE: Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint by filing an amended complaint by February 24, 2025, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims specified above be dismissed without leave for further amendment. ( Amended Complaint due by 2/24/2025.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 02/03/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Proper Form Order Mon 02/03 11:21 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 2/24/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 02/03/2025. (cpri )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
2 2 misc True Division for Trial Tue 01/28 10:14 AM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (cpri)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT, filed by Patrick Williams. against Jordan Cox, J. Meeks, South Carolina, State of, Woods.(cpri )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope