District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00240
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Case in other court:USCA, 25-05087
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Amicus
CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Represented By
Andrew Tutt
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Amicus
CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
Represented By
Brianne Jenna Gorod
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
FRANK KENDALL
Hon. 6823 Stockwell Manor Drive
Falls Church, VA 22043
Represented By
Andrew Tutt
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF VERMONT
Vermont Attorney General 109 State Street
Montpelier, VT 05609
Represented By
Jonathan T. Rose
Office Of Attorney General/vt
contact info
Amicus
STATE OF WASHINGTON
Defendant
DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
TERENCE EMMERT
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
PETER B. HEGSETH
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
TELITA CROSLAND
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
MARK F. AVERILL
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
GARY ASHWORTH
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
REGAN MORGAN
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
KATE COLE
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
VERA WOLF
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
QUINN TYSON
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
DANY DANRIDGE
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMIE HASH
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
GREYSON SHISHKINA
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
AMIAH SALE
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ROAN PICKETT
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
MIRIAM PERELSON
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
ERICA VANDAL
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
CLAYTON MCCALLISTER
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
GORDON HERRERO
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
AUDRIE GRAHAM
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
KODA NATURE
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE BLOOMROSE
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
MINERVA BETTIS
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
CAEL NEARY
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMUEL AHEARN
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
NICOLAS TALBOTT
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski P.C.
contact info
Inga S. Bernstein
Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Shannon P. Minter
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sarah K. Austin
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Amy Whelan
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Mary Bonauto
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Jennifer Levi
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
Christopher F. Stoll
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Sara E. Kropf
Kropf Moseley PLLC
contact info
Michael R. Haley
Glbtq Legal Advocates & Defenders
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
Terminated: 02/13/2025
Represented By
Jean Lin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason C. Lynch
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Layendecker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Manion
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Plaintiffs' 72 Renewed Application for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 03/18/2025. (lcacr2)
GPO Mar 26 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 91 Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and for a Stay Pending Appeal. See document for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 03/26/2025. (lcacr2)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
103 103 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/02 2:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TELITA CROSLAND, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PETER B. HEGSETH, MARK F. AVERILL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, TERENCE EMMERT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, GARY ASHWORTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE.(Layendecker, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/02 4:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants'103 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs'94 Fourth Amended Complaint on or before May 7, 2025. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 04/02/2025. (lcacr2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
102 102 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 03/27 8:25 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re101 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjm) (Main Document 102 replaced on 3/27/2025) (zjm).
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 03/27 3:08 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5087 for101 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by PETER B. HEGSETH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, MARK F. AVERILL, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TERENCE EMMERT, TELITA CROSLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, GARY ASHWORTH, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
101 101 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Wed 03/26 9:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to88 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,89 Memorandum & Opinion, , Order,100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Order on Motion to Stay . by TELITA CROSLAND, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PETER B. HEGSETH, MARK F. AVERILL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, TERENCE EMMERT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, GARY ASHWORTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lin, Jean) Modified on 3/27/2025 to add docket link (zjm).
Related: [-]
100 100 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Order on Motion to Stay Wed 03/26 6:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants'91 Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and for a Stay Pending Appeal. See document for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 03/26/2025. (lcacr2) (Main Document 100 reposted on 3/27/2025) (hmc).
Related: [-]