GOMBASH v. THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Evelyn Padin |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00772 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2025 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Essex County, ESX-L-008851-24 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STACEY GOMBASH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AS AGREED UPON BINDING ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 2/11/2025. (ld) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/11 2:01 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld) |
||
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AS AGREED UPON BINDING ARBITRATION by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC. (LAJEWSKI, LESLIE) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY EDWARD RUSSO on behalf of THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC (RUSSO, ANTHONY) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SALVO on behalf of THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC (SALVO, MICHAEL) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE A. LAJEWSKI on behalf of THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC (LAJEWSKI, LESLIE) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 01/29 9:44 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/18/2025. (ld) |
||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 01/29 2:53 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The4 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC on 1/28/2025 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/18/2025. (wh) |
||
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE S WEINSTEIN on behalf of STACEY GOMBASH (WEINSTEIN, JESSE) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer to the Complaint.. (LAJEWSKI, LESLIE) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Diversity Disclosure Statement by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC. (LAJEWSKI, LESLIE) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC identifying NMG Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (LAJEWSKI, LESLIE) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC from Superior Court of NJ - Essex County, case number ESX-L-008851-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15975169), filed by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC.(LAJEWSKI, LESLIE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/28 5:01 PM
Case assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (tjg, ) |