Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-15262

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:25-ap-00030
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Donaciano Castillo
7138 S Christiana Ave
Chicago, IL 60629
Represented By
Donaciano Castillo
contact info
Plaintiff
Connexus Credit Union
Galanis, Pollack, Jacobs & Johnson 413 N. 2nd Street, Suite 150
Milwaukee, WI 53203
Represented By
Joshua Brady
Galanis, Pollack, Jacobs & Johnson S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
15 15 motion Amended Motion Tue 05/20 3:40 PM
Amended Notice of Motion and Amended Motion Related [+] Filed by Joshua Brady on behalf of Connexus Credit Union. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Brady, Joshua)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 05/20 10:44 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 06/17/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 10 Default Judgment
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 05/20 10:44 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/17/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling, , , . (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 order Default Judgment Tue 05/20 10:44 AM
(E)Order Withdrawing Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
11 11 utility U - Corrective Entry Wed 05/14 11:37 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY PDF/Event Error, Filer Notified Related [+]. (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/13 10:26 PM
PDF/Event Error, Filer Notified Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Joshua Brady on behalf of Connexus Credit Union. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Brady, Joshua)Modified on 5/14/2025 (VG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of No Answer
Att: 2 Affidavit plaintiff non-military affidavit
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 04/22 12:01 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 04/22 12:01 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 05/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 5 Default Judgment
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 04/08 11:28 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 04/08 11:28 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 04/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-] 5 Default Judgment
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/07 5:35 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Joshua Brady on behalf of Connexus Credit Union. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Brady, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 misc Proof of Service Mon 04/07 5:13 PM
Proof of Service Substitute Service of Process Filed by Joshua Brady on behalf of Connexus Credit Union Related [+]. (Brady, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Mon 01/27 5:57 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Joshua Brady on behalf of Connexus Credit Union Related [+]. (Brady, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/27 5:56 PM
Summons Issued on Donaciano Castillo Answer Due 02/26/2025 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/27 5:56 PM
Adversary case 25-00030 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Connexus Credit Union against Donaciano Castillo. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Brady, Joshua)
Related: [-]