Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:25-cv-00469
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
FUNDING METRICS, LLC
Defendant
MCA DEBT ADVISORS, LLC
Defendant
DAVID SCHOFIELD
Defendant
JOSEPH WILLIAMS
Plaintiff
FAITH KEEHFUSS
Represented By
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
Kristen M. Doyle
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
JEREMY M. CERUTTI
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by FAITH KEEHFUSS. (CERUTTI, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Fri 04/18 8:13 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 5/26/25 WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/17/25. 4/18/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 04/17 1:06 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney) for Extension of Time of All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FUNDING METRICS, LLC. (VERBONITZ, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VERBONITZ on behalf of FUNDING METRICS, LLC with Certificate of Service(VERBONITZ, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/13 3:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FAITH KEEHFUSS. JOSEPH WILLIAMS waiver sent on 2/25/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/13 1:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FAITH KEEHFUSS. FUNDING METRICS, LLC waiver sent on 2/25/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/13 12:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FAITH KEEHFUSS. MCA DEBT ADVISORS, LLC waiver sent on 2/25/2025, answer due 4/28/2025; DAVID SCHOFIELD waiver sent on 2/25/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M. Doyle on behalf of FAITH KEEHFUSS (Doyle, Kristen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of FAITH KEEHFUSS (CERUTTI, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 9:05 AM
Summons Issued as to FUNDING METRICS, LLC, MCA DEBT ADVISORS, LLC, DAVID SCHOFIELD, JOSEPH WILLIAMS. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 1/29/2025 (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 01/28 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against FUNDING METRICS, LLC, MCA DEBT ADVISORS, LLC, DAVID SCHOFIELD, JOSEPH WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18034514.), filed by FAITH KEEHFUSS.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]