Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10824

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-ap-01016
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC
Represented By
Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa M. Shambro
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info
Lindsay Riley
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
12 12 order Reschedule Hearing Wed 05/14 11:43 AM
Notice Of Reschedule Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 10:30 AM Courtroom C . (td)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,10 Response
Monday, May 12, 2025
11 11 court Notice of Hearing Mon 05/12 3:31 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/5/2025 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C. (td)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,10 Response
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 answer Response Wed 04/23 4:00 PM
Response Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/09 10:20 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Gabrielle Palmer on behalf of Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC Related [+]. (Palmer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 04/03 3:27 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline To Answer Complaint. Answer Due 4/10/2025 Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 04/02 7:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Andrew D. Johnson on behalf of Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC Related [+]. (Johnson, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 01/28 10:39 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Champion Lovelock Law fka Jones Lovelock, PLLC on January 28, 2025 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/28 10:36 AM
Summons Issued on Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC Answer Due 02/27/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 01/28 10:23 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Champion Lovelock Law fka Jones Lovelock, PLLC on January 28, 2025 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/28 10:17 AM
Summons Issued on Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC Answer Due 02/27/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 01/28 10:15 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-01016 MER] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A33373065. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 10:15 AM
Adversary case 25-01016 Complaint by Lisa M. Shambro against Champion Lovelock Law f/k/a Jones Lovelock, PLLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 04/28/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]