Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:25-cv-10218
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Allegheny Health Network
Represented By
Pietro A. Conte
Donnelly Conroy & Gelhaar
contact info
Peter K. Levitt
Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
IntraSystems, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer R. O'Shea
Winget, Spadafora & Schwartzberg, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sally Fitzgerald
Represented By
Charles E. Schaffer
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
Randi A. Kassan
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman
contact info
Jeffrey S. Goldenberg
Goldenberg Schneider, Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 misccs Electronic Notice re transfer of civil action Wed 04/09 2:15 PM
Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania and assigned civil case number 2:25-cv-00486. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
14 14 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Tue 04/08 10:22 AM
Case transferred to Western District of Pennsylvania. Original file sent to Clerk in that district. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 04/07 4:57 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Transfer Matter to the Western District of Pennsylvania for Consolidation with Related Matters by Allegheny Health Network. (Conte, Pietro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 03/04 8:29 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Charles E. Schaffer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (JAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/03 2:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles E. Schaffer Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10868420 by Sally Fitzgerald.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Charles E. Schaffer in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 11:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allegheny Health Network. Allegheny Health Network waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Levitt, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pietro A. Conte on behalf of Allegheny Health Network (Conte, Pietro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Levitt on behalf of Allegheny Health Network (Levitt, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/24 12:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sally Fitzgerald. IntraSystems, LLC waiver sent on 2/21/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 02/14 1:27 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey S. Goldenberg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (JAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/14 12:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey S. Goldenberg Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10841798 by Sally Fitzgerald.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Goldenberg in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer R. O'Shea on behalf of IntraSystems, LLC (O'Shea, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (JKK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 01/28 4:43 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges. (CEH)
Related: [-]
1 1 61 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Allegheny Health Network, IntraSystems, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10810635 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sally Fitzgerald.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form