California Southern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Battaglia
Referred: Daniel E Butcher
Case #: 3:25-cv-00196
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 2:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Atlantic Animal Health, Inc.
Defendant
Neogen Corporation
Plaintiff
Jenny Barrett
Represented By
Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Fitzpatrick & Swanston
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanne Mercer
Represented By
Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Fitzpatrick & Swanston
contact info
Plaintiff
Caroline Oddie
Represented By
Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Fitzpatrick & Swanston
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanna Pitzen
Represented By
Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Fitzpatrick & Swanston
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
25 25 14 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/25 12:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Atlantic Animal Health, Inc., Neogen Corporation, filed by Joanna Pitzen, Joanne Mercer, Jenny Barrett, Caroline Oddie. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 04/24 12:12 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss as Moot (Doc. Nos.15 and23 ). Amended Pleadings due on or before 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/24/2025. (maq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/23 2:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Jenny Barrett, Joanne Mercer, Caroline Oddie, Joanna Pitzen.(Schwarz, Ashlea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 04/14 8:29 AM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Neogen Corporation. (Anderson, Joan) (maq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/09 11:51 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 respm Non Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 2:44 PM
NON Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jenny Barrett, Joanne Mercer, Caroline Oddie, Joanna Pitzen. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 2:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jenny Barrett, Joanne Mercer, Caroline Oddie, Joanna Pitzen. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Mon 03/24 10:18 AM
ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA Setting Briefing Schedule re15 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 4/7/2025; Replies due by 4/14/2025; Sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (syi)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Mon 03/24 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Neogen Corporation . Identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for Neogen Corporation. (Anderson, Joan)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 10:09 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neogen Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Anderson, Joan)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 03/24 10:06 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Neogen Corporation.(Anderson, Joan)Attorney Joan S. Anderson added to party Neogen Corporation(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 03/20 10:58 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard M. Paul, III, re10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/20/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 03/20 10:57 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Haley Rachelle Hawn, re11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/20/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 03/20 10:56 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashlea G. Schwarz, re9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/20/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 1:18 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hawn, Haley) (exs)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 1:05 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Paul, Richard) (exs)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 1:03 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schwarz, Ashlea) (exs)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 1:01 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hawn, Haley) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 1:20 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19708099.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Paul, Richard) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 11:28 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19707113.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schwarz, Ashlea) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 9:51 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19706036.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hawn, Haley) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/17 6:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joanna Pitzen, Joanne Mercer, Jenny Barrett, Caroline Oddie, as to Atlantic Animal Health, Inc.. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/03 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanna Pitzen, Joanne Mercer, Jenny Barrett, Caroline Oddie. Neogen Corporation served. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (maq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/28 2:01 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Atlantic Animal Health, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19549289.), filed by Joanna Pitzen, Joanne Mercer, Jenny Barrett, Caroline Oddie. The new case number is 3:25-cv-196-AJB-DEB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard)(axc1)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet