Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:25-cv-00099
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:18 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Carabin Shaw, P.C.
Represented By
Zachary Kaleb Gilbert
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc.
contact info
Ricardo G. Cedillo
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza
contact info
Derick J. Rodgers
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza , Inc.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jamie Shaw
Represented By
Zachary Kaleb Gilbert
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc.
contact info
Ricardo G. Cedillo
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza
contact info
Derick J. Rodgers
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza , Inc.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Kirsten Carabin
Represented By
Jason Davis
Davis & Santos, P.C.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Carabin Law, P.C.
Represented By
Jason Davis
Davis & Santos, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kirsten Carabin
605 E. Dewey Place
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Jason Davis
Davis & Santos, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Carabin Law, P.C.
Represented By
Jason Davis
Davis & Santos, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carabin Shaw, P.C.
Represented By
Zachary Kaleb Gilbert
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc.
contact info
Ricardo G. Cedillo
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza
contact info
Derick J. Rodgers
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza , Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamie Shaw
Represented By
Zachary Kaleb Gilbert
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc.
contact info
Ricardo G. Cedillo
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza
contact info
Derick J. Rodgers
Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza , Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
30 30 misc Brief Thu 05/01 12:13 PM
BRIEF in Support regarding16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS by Jamie Shaw. (Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
29 29 transcript Transcript Filed Wed 04/23 4:02 PM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 4-17-25, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference and Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/14/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2025, (gs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
28 28 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/17 3:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 4/17/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/16 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Scardino on behalf of Kirsten Carabin, Carabin Law, P.C.. Attorney Daniel Scardino added to party Kirsten Carabin(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Scardino added to party Carabin Law, P.C.(pty:dft) (Scardino, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/15 7:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kirsten Carabin, Carabin Law, P.C., re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Jamie Shaw(Davis, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 04/11 4:48 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jamie Shaw. (Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/09 10:19 AM
Text Order GRANTING22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended to April 15, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cwlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
24 24 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/08 6:27 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Kirsten Carabin, Carabin Law, P.C.. (Davis, Jason)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 04/08 6:25 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carabin Law, P.C.. (Davis, Jason)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/08 6:22 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS by Kirsten Carabin, Carabin Law, P.C..(Davis, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/07 3:36 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, ( Status Conference set for 4/17/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/07 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2026 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection & Jury Trial set for 6/22/2026 09:00AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/6/2026, Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025, Discovery due by 9/30/2025, Motions due by 1/6/2026,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
19 19 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/03 6:20 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw. (Gilbert, Zachary)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 04/03 6:19 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw. (Gilbert, Zachary)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Thu 04/03 6:18 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw. (Gilbert, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/28 2:25 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS by Jamie Shaw.(Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 misc Advisory to the Court Mon 03/17 4:08 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw JOINT ADVISORY REGARDING STATUS OF LITIGATION . (Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/07 3:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Jason Davis added to party Kirsten Carabin(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Davis added to party Carabin Law, P.C.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw by Carabin Law, P.C., Kirsten Carabin.(Davis, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 9 pgs order Order Wed 03/05 10:42 AM
ORDER AND ADVISORY-- It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formats shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by April 3, 2025. Failure to do so may result in the Courts entering its own scheduling order.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
12 12 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/11 9:22 AM
AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2025 re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Jamie Shaw, Carabin Shaw, P.C. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(vl)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 02/03 10:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2025 re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Jamie Shaw, Carabin Shaw, P.C. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(vl)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Fri 01/31 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Order Fri 01/31 10:59 AM
Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw. (Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Order Fri 01/31 9:04 AM
Proposed Order to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw. (Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 01/30 2:14 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing-This case is set for an in-personhearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 3) on Friday, January 31, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom H, United States Courthouse, 262 West Nueva, San Antonio, Texas 78207. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2025 03:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Thu 01/30 11:22 AM
Report on Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (vl)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 10:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Kirsten Carabin, Carabin Law, P.C.. (vl)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/30 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (vl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Thu 01/30 10:41 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (vl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
4 4 misc Attachment Tue 01/28 5:04 PM
ATTACHMENT Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Ricardo G. Cedillo to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw.(Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 01/28 4:48 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw.(Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D,
Att: 5 Affidavit
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/28 4:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw. (Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19719684), filed by Carabin Shaw, P.C., Jamie Shaw.(Cedillo, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh D