Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:25-cv-00064
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:45 AM MDT
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
Big West Oil
Represented By
Brenn C. Bouwhuis
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Z. Ryan Pahnke
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Samuel A. Lambert
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/29 10:28 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint. United States of America shall file its answer/response to the Complaint on or before 5/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 1:51 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint filed by Defendant United States of America. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Watson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 04/02 8:47 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant United States of America. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 4/23/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/01 3:56 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: The United States shall file its response to the Complaint on or before April 28, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/1/25. (dle)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/01 2:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint filed by Defendant United States of America. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Ryan S. Watson added to party United States of America(pty:dft)(Watson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Thu 02/13 10:29 AM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Big West Oil. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Acknowledgment Mon 02/03 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order4 filed by Plaintiff Big West Oil (Bouwhuis, Brenn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Fri 01/31 4:02 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/31/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 01/31 9:04 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America - IRS. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 01/31 9:03 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America - Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 01/31 9:03 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/30 2:37 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/30/2025. (lwh)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Civil Standing Order Thu 01/30 2:26 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/30/2025. (lwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 01/29 7:48 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Big West Oil. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 2/19/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
2 2 5 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Tue 01/28 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5314686) filed by Big West Oil. (Bouwhuis, Brenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Tue 01/28 4:05 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Big West Oil is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]