Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Shalina D Kumar
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 4:25-cv-10224
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
Chesaning Police Department
Defendant
Rebecca Short
Plaintiff
Earl Blount, Jr
607 36th St
Bay City, MI 48708


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
9 9 service Acknowledgment Thu 04/03 4:25 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Rebecca Short. Documents mailed by USMS on 04/03/2025. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued* Mon 03/24 10:10 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Rebecca Short* (JHea)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Wed 03/19 1:54 PM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
misc Pro Se E-filing Access Given Tue 03/18 1:22 PM
Pro Se E-filing Access Given to Earl Blount [E-filer], Jr. (THum)
Related: [-]
service Service Documents Received Wed 03/19 10:37 AM
Service Documents Received (LGra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 order Directing Service by the US Marshal Tue 03/04 3:42 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 03/04 3:40 PM
ORDER Granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Partially Dismissing1 Complaint. Chesaning Police Department terminated. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 03/04 3:45 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order and6 Order Directing Service by the US Marshal on Earl Blount, Jr., 607 36th St., Bay City, MI 48708 (THal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Tue 01/28 12:36 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (CShr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Earl Blount, Jr. (JPar)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Earl Blount, Jr against Chesaning Police Department, Rebecca Short (JPar)
Related: [-]