South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00485
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Charleston Holdings 464 LP
Represented By
Jefferson Boone Aiken, IV
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (flo)
contact info
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (col)
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Friedlam Partners LLC
Represented By
Jefferson Boone Aiken, IV
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (flo)
contact info
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (col)
contact info
Defendant
Merian Rodezno
Represented By
Jefferson Boone Aiken, IV
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (flo)
contact info
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (col)
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven L Nesbitt
Represented By
Mary Kathleen Linton
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info
Julie Lauren Moore
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info
J Rutledge Young, III
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tonya Nesbitt
Represented By
Mary Kathleen Linton
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info
Julie Lauren Moore
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info
J Rutledge Young, III
Duffy And Young LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 misc Document E-Mailed Document Mailed Tue 04/29 3:29 PM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED and ***DOCUMENT MAILED23 certified filed copy of Order on Motion to Remand to State Court and NEF, to jarmstrong@charlestoncounty.org and placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Clerk of Court Charleston County Court of Common Pleas 100 Broad St Ste 106 Charleston, SC 29401-2210 (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 04/28 12:19 PM
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Remand to State Court. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/28/2025.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 service Acceptance of Service - Complaint Served Tue 04/22 3:30 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt. Sharna Littlejohn served on 4/22/2025, answer due 5/13/2025.(Young, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Acceptance of Service
Thursday, April 17, 2025
21 21 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Sharna Littlejohn. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/17 10:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt. Service due by 7/16/2025 (Young, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 10:37 AM
ORDER Plaintiffs' motion to amend (Dkt. Nos. 14 -7), is GRANTED. Within ten (10) days of this Order Plaintiffs are directed to file on the docket their amended pleadings. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/8/2025. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 04/07 2:48 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Richard M Gergel: Telephone Conference held on 4/7/2025 re Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Attorney Young present for the Plaintiff and Attorney Ruparelia present for the Defendant. Court Reporter Karen Martin. (vdru, )
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/07 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 02:30 PM before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Court to provide dial in number.(vdru, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 order Order Wed 03/26 11:42 AM
TEXT ORDER re 15 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance filed by Merian Rodezno, Friedlam Partners LLC, Charleston Holdings 464 LP for Roopal S Ruparelia for 06/18/2025 through 07/06/2025. Counsel should please know the protection request is duly noted and taken under advisement. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/26/2025. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 03/25 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Roopal S Ruparelia for 06/18/2025 through 07/06/2025 (Ruparelia, Roopal)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/14 5:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt.(Young, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - Defendants' Discovery Responses,
Att: 2 Ex. 2 - June 10, 2024 email from Ruparelia,
Att: 3 Ex. 3 - June 13, 2024 email from Linton to Ruparelia,
Att: 4 Ex. 4 - June 17, 2024 email from Ruparelia to Linton,
Att: 5 Ex. 5 - Aff. of Merian Rodezno,
Att: 6 Ex. 6 - Dec. 17, 2024 email from Ruparelia to Daniel,
Att: 7 Ex. 7 - Motion to Amend Complaint
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/07 11:48 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Charleston Holdings 464 LP, Friedlam Partners LLC, Merian Rodezno.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/14/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Ruparelia, Roopal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Merian Rodezno,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email dated March 4, 2022
Thursday, March 06, 2025
12 12 order Mediation Order Thu 03/06 11:59 AM
ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 9/29/2025--mediation requirements set forth in Order. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/6/2025. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 11:57 AM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Mediation due by See separate Order, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/28/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/28/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/11/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/7/2025, Discovery due by 8/29/2025, Motion in Limine must be filed no sooner than fifteen (15) days and no later than ten (10) days prior to the date certain set for jury selection and trial, Motions due by 9/12/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to the date set for jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 11/3/2025 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/6/2025. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/04 3:12 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston Holdings 464 LP, Friedlam Partners LLC, Merian Rodezno.(Ruparelia, Roopal)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/04 1:43 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt.(Young, J)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Tue 03/04 1:43 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt.(Young, J)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Rule 26(f) Report Tue 03/04 1:42 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt.(Young, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Mediation Form
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 motion Remand to State Court Fri 02/21 4:30 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Steven L Nesbitt, Tonya Nesbitt. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Young, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Ex. 1 - Merian Rodezno's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Ex. 2 - Defendants' Discovery Responses,
Att: 4 Ex. 3 - December 17, 2024 email identifying property manager
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/28 12:47 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/18/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/4/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 3/4/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/28/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/28/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/27/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/7/2025, Discovery due by 7/28/2025, Motion in Limine must be filed no sooner than fifteen (15) days and no later than ten (10) days prior to the date certain set for jury selection and trial, Motions due by 8/11/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to the date set for jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 11/3/2025 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/28/2025. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 01/28 11:33 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Friedlam Partners LLC, Merian Rodezno, Charleston Holdings 464 LP.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Tue 01/28 11:32 AM
ANSWER/AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)(filed in state court) by Friedlam Partners LLC, Merian Rodezno, Charleston Holdings 464 LP. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/28 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP 10-00822 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12226312), filed by Charleston Holdings 464 LP, Merian Rodezno, Friedlam Partners LLC.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit complaint,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Merian Rodezno,
Att: 3 State Court Documents state court pleadings,
Att: 4 Memo in Support of notice of removal and exhibits