California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:25-bk-10465
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Mar 06, 2025

Debtor
Lindsey Wayne Gatewood
3470 Somerdale St
Corona, CA 92879-5344
Represented By
Michael Jay Berger
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Todd A. Frealy (TR)
3403 Tenth Street, Suite 709
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 01/29/2025 12:31 AM PST
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 01/28 3:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:6:25-bk-10465] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57966165. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 68 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 01/28 3:29 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Lindsey Wayne Gatewood (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Tue 01/28 3:32 PM
Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Lindsey Wayne Gatewood. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition) Tue 01/28 3:33 PM
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lindsey Wayne Gatewood. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1) Tue 01/28 3:34 PM
Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) with paystubs Filed by Debtor Lindsey Wayne Gatewood. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 01/28 4:06 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Frealy (TR), Todd A. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/6/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Frealy: Meeting ID 339 282 2477, Passcode 8221171064, Phone 1 909 498 7848. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]