Original Case: 1:24-cv-02695

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05014
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 4:23 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Health and Human Services, Office for Civil Rights, General Attorney or ALL Member of the Board, Chair of the Board
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jose L. Canales Cancel
Represented By
Jose L. Canales Cancel
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/29/2025 4:23 AM EST
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5014
Related: [-]
13 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2096951] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-cv-02695-UNA filed by Jose L. Canales Cancel. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5014 25-5014
Related: [-]
2 pgs MOTION [2096955] to appoint counsel filed by Jose L. Canales Cancel [Service Date: 01/28/2025 ] Length Certification: 2 pages. 25-5014
Related: [-]
3 pgs MOTION [2096960] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Jose L. Canales Cancel [Service Date: 01/28/2025 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. 25-5014
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2096974] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 25-5014 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:24cv2695 from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. 25-5014
Related: [-]
27 pgs NOTICE [2097057] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record 25-5014
Related: [-]