Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:25-cv-10266
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Case in other court:Lapeer County Circuit Court, 24-058057-NI
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
Nicole M. Wright
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Kauranen
Represented By
Victoria Lynn Nagy
Mindell Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 9 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 05/15 12:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT adding HOME CITY ICE COMPANY filed by Dawn Kauranen against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Nagy, Victoria)
Related: [-]
service Request for Additional Summons Thu 05/15 12:02 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Home City Ice Company. (Nagy, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
11 11 notice Non-Party Fault Wed 05/14 10:08 PM
NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by All Defendants (Keyes, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 order Protective Order Fri 04/04 10:58 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.26(c)(1). Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/19 9:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/19/2025; Discovery due by 1/20/2026; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2026 03:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey; Jury Trial set for 4/14/2026 08:30 AM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. Related [+] (SOso)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
8 8 notice Appearance Tue 03/18 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Keyes on behalf of Walmart, Inc.. (Keyes, Melissa)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 03/18 4:55 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Scheduling Conference held on 3/18/2025 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (SOso)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Fri 03/07 3:39 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 notice Appearance Fri 02/21 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lynn Nagy on behalf of Dawn Kauranen. (Nagy, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 notice Appear* Thu 02/20 3:38 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2025 02:30 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ***Parties are to file a FRCP 26(f) one week prior to conference*** (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/19 4:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Demand for Trial by Jury by Walmart, Inc.. (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 order Stipulation and Order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Tue 02/18 12:01 PM
SECOND STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Walmart Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, ( Response due by 2/19/2025 ) Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 01/31 1:06 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Walmart, Inc. (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Wed 01/29 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc., d/b/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Lapeer County Circuit Court, case number 24-058057-NI. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10097067 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint, Dated December 30, 2024,
Att: 3 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal,
Att: 4 Exhibit Stipulated Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, submitted for entry, January 15, 2025,
Att: 5 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiffs Attorney Capping Damages, Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages and Email, Dated January 9, 2025
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 01/29 4:01 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (THum)
Related: [-]