Iowa Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00004
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 1:19 AM CST
Defendant
Daxxton Cook (2)
Defendant
D'quon Morrow (1)
Represented By
Jennifer Weaver
Jennifer Weaver Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Isaiah Pirtle (3)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Devra Hake
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 7 of the Indictment as to D'quon Morrow. Objections to R&R due by 4/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/28/2025. (pac)
GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER accepting 49 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 7 of the Indictment as to Defendant D'quon Morrow. Signed by Chief Judge CJ Williams on 4/14/2025. (jag)
GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER accepting 49 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 7 of the Indictment as to Defendant D'quon Morrow. Signed by Chief Judge CJ Williams on 4/14/2025. (jag)
GPO Apr 28 2025
ORDER accepting 58 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 1 of the Indictment as to Defendant Daxxton Cook. Signed by Chief Judge CJ Williams on 4/28/2025. (jag)
GPO Apr 28 2025
ORDER accepting 58 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 1 of the Indictment as to Defendant Daxxton Cook. Signed by Chief Judge CJ Williams on 4/28/2025. (jag)
GPO Apr 29 2025
ORDER accepting 62 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 1 of the Indictment as to Defendant Isaiah Pirtle. Signed by Chief Judge CJ Williams on 4/29/2025. (jag)

Docket last updated: 01/30/2025 2:24 AM CST
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
Judge update in case as to D'quon Morrow, Daxxton Cook, Isaiah Pirtle: Chief Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (mmc)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED Indictment as to D'quon Morrow (1) Count(s) 1, 2, 6, 7, 8, 9, Daxxton Cook (2) Count(s) 1, 3, 6, Isaiah Pirtle (3) Count(s) 1, 4, 5, 6. (mmc)
Related: [-]
5 5 7 pgs REDACTED Indictment as to D'quon Morrow, Daxxton Cook, Isaiah Pirtle. (eUSM) (mmc)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Sealing Indictment and Warrant until the arrest of the first defendant as to Defendants D'quon Morrow, Daxxton Cook, Isaiah Pirtle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/15/2025. (eUSM) (mmc)
Related: [-]