New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-00867
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
From You Flowers, LLC
Represented By
Bety Javidzad
Dentons
contact info
Alyssa Johanna Landow
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Norman Aspis
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Cody Anthony
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberley Mahabal
Represented By
Cody Laux
Clarkson Law Firm PC
contact info
Kristen Simplicio
Clarkson Law Firm
contact info
Ryan Clarkson
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Trevor Walterlakes
Represented By
Cody Laux
Clarkson Law Firm PC
contact info
Kristen Simplicio
Clarkson Law Firm
contact info
Ryan Clarkson
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/15 3:57 PM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 5/9/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/15/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/15 2:45 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or File a Request for a Pre-Motion Conference Concerning the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Robert Y. Sperling dated April 15, 2025. Document filed by From You Flowers, LLC..(Sperling, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine B Forrest on behalf of From You Flowers, LLC..(Forrest, Katherine)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 04/08 10:50 AM
STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the law firm of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 1285 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10019-6064, will be and hereby is substituted for Dentons US LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10020, 601 South Figueroa Suite 2500, Los Angeles, CA 90017, and 4655 Executive Drive Suite 700, San Diego, CA 92121, as counsel of record for defendant From You Flowers, LLC, in the above-captioned action. The undersigned, defendant From You Flowers, LLC, hereby consents to the proposed substitution of counsel as set forth above. SO ORDERED. Attorney Robert Y. Sperling,Staci Lynn Yablon,Xinshu Sui for From You Flowers, LLC added. Attorney Bety Javidzad; Alyssa Johanna Landow; Cody Anthony and Norman Aspis terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/8/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
23 23 misc Proposed Order for Substitution of Attorney Mon 04/07 10:56 PM
PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by From You Flowers, LLC..(Sperling, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/28 12:41 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against From You Flowers, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Trevor Walterlakes, Anthony Gunzl. Related document:1 Complaint..(Simplicio, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/28 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Kimberley Mahabal Only Without Prejudice. Document filed by Kimberley Mahabal..(Simplicio, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/21 9:58 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the amended complaint, as proposed, on or before March 28, 2025. However, the parties are admonished to familiarize themselves with this Court's individual rules, which requires that parties wishing to move to file a motion to dismiss to request a pre-motion conference. Accordingly, on or before April 25, 2025, Defendant shall either answer or file a request for a pre-motion conference. The parties are reminded that failure to comply with this Order or with any order of the Court or failure to comply with the FRCP, the Local Rules for the SDNY or this Court's Individual Practice Rules, or the parties' discovery or other obligations thereunder may result in sanctions, including monetary penalties on counsel and/or the parties, dismissal or preclusion of claims, defenses, arguments, or evidence. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2025. Motions due by 4/25/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/20/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/20 2:01 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kristen Simplicio dated March 20, 2025. Document filed by Kimberley Mahabal, Trevor Walterlakes..(Simplicio, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/13 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cody Anthony on behalf of From You Flowers, LLC..(Anthony, Cody)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 3:06 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Bety Javidzad to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 10:52 AM
MOTION for Bety Javidzad to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30684134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by From You Flowers, LLC..(Javidzad, Bety)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Bety Javidzad ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit -1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Por Hac Vice
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 10:42 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Kristen Simplicio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 02/27 10:20 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 14 MOTION for Kristen Simplicio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30680775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 02/27 11:11 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Bety Javidzad to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30684134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 6:50 PM
MOTION for Kristen Simplicio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30680775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trevor Walterlakes, Kimberley Mahabal..(Simplicio, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kristen Simplicio,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of the State of California,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of the District of Columbia,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Admission of Kristen Simplicio Pro Hac Vice
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 9:50 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Norman M. Aspis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/24 12:17 PM
MOTION for Norman M. Aspis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30662824. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by From You Flowers, LLC..(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit ISO of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit -1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order [Proposed} Order for Admission Por Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 02/24 12:29 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Norman M. Aspis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30662824. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/19 9:42 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. From You Flowers, LLC answer due 3/24/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/18/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 9:06 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Cody Laux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/14 5:45 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint until March 24, 2025 addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alyssa J. Landow dated February 14, 2025. Document filed by From You Flowers, LLC..(Landow, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 5:42 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Xdora LLC for From You Flowers, LLC. Document filed by From You Flowers, LLC..(Landow, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alyssa Johanna Landow on behalf of From You Flowers, LLC..(Landow, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/14 2:02 PM
MOTION for Cody Laux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30622968. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trevor Walterlakes, Kimberley Mahabal..(Laux, Cody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Cody Laux,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of the State of California,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Admission of Cody Laux Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 02/14 2:38 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Cody Laux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30622968. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/05 7:52 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. From You Flowers, LLC served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025. Service was accepted by David Layne, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Trevor Walterlakes; Kimberley Mahabal..(Clarkson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 1:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to From You Flowers, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 01/30 9:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/30 9:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 01/30 9:55 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 01/30 9:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ryan Clarkson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Trevor Walterlakes, Kimberley Mahabal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 01/30 9:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryan Clarkson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case - Other; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/29 8:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to From You Flowers, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Trevor Walterlakes, Kimberley Mahabal..(Clarkson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/29 8:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clarkson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 59 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/29 8:02 PM
COMPLAINT against From You Flowers, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30536148)Document filed by Trevor Walterlakes, Kimberley Mahabal..(Clarkson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A