Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:25-cv-00382
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Gwinnett County, 24-A-11329-10
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Represented By
Geoffrey Randall Hafer
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Philip Wade Savrin
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Interested Party
Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC
Interested Party
ISAOA
Plaintiff
ATK Marriage & Family Coaching LLC
Represented By
Michael Davis Turner
Huggins Law Firm, LLC
contact info
J. Remington Huggins
Huggins Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Thu 04/03 2:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc..(Savrin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc..(Savrin, Philip)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 12:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by ATK Marriage & Family Coaching LLC.(Turner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 12:42 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ALTOHA Inc. for Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 10:44 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATK Marriage & Family Coaching LLC. (Turner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 03/06 3:07 PM
ORDER. This case is before the Court on a sua sponte review. Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement using the form required by Local Rule 3.3 within 14 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/6/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 3:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:4 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 8/5/2025. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/6/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 03/06 2:14 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 02/05 9:44 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/7/2025.(Savrin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Wed 01/29 1:26 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/29/2025. (bnp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 01/29 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14022260)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint in State Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Pre-suit Format Demand,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet