Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00057
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 1:18 AM CST
Defendant
David Salinas-Gutierrez (1)
Represented By
Thomas Sullivan Reese
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Bailey
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/30/2025 2:23 AM CST
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
ARREST on Charges Pending in Another District(Rule 5) as to David Salinas-Gutierrez (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION for Detention Pending Revocation or Modification of Probation or Supervised Release by USA as to David Salinas-Gutierrez [Note: Attorney Adam Bailey added to party USA(pty:pla).] (Bailey, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to David Salinas-Gutierrez (Bailey, Adam)
Related: [-] 1 MOTION for Detention Pending Revocation or Modification of Probation or Supervised Release
3 3 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings held on 1/28/2025 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #1 moot, #2 moot, appointing FPD attorney Thomas Sullivan Reese for David Salinas-Gutierrez, ordering defendant be detained as to David Salinas-Gutierrez Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 1 MOTION for Detention Pending Revocation or Modification of Probation or Supervised Release ,2 MOTION for Hearing
4 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , appointing FPD attorney as to David Salinas-Gutierrez (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearing by David Salinas-Gutierrez (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT to Another District (Rule5) by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne as to David Salinas-Gutierrez (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE to USDC SD/TX of a Rule 32.1 Initial Appearance on Revocation as to David Salinas-Gutierrez. Your case number is: 1:15-cr-502. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you require a financial ledger and/or certified copies of any documents, please send a request to CM-ECFIntake_oknd@oknd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. as to David Salinas-Gutierrez (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]