Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 9:25-cv-80134
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Abruzzo
Defendant
Scott Kerner
Defendant
Adam Schwartz
Plaintiff
Johnny Horne
11386 61st St. N
West Palm Beach, FL 33412
Plaintiff
Marlene Horne
11386 61st St. N
West Palm Beach, FL 33412


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/05 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Non-Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (jas)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing Wed 02/05 5:25 PM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: fixitall.jha.gmail.com (jas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
22 22 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 02/04 9:49 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. For the reasons explained in the Court's Order Dismissing Case20 , Plaintiffs' Motions [9, 13, 14, 19] are denied, and Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint of Judicial Misconduct15 is dismissed with prejudice. This case remains closed. Plaintiffs are cautioned that future improper filings in this case will be stricken without further notice and that failure to comply with this Order and the Local Rules may result in Plaintiffs being deemed vexatious litigants. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Johnny Horne and Marlene Horne at the addresses listed on the docket. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/4/2025. (jco)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 02/04 11:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re20 Order Dismissing/Closing Case: Mailing to Plaintiffs a copy of20 ORDER to the addresses listed in the Order. (caw)
Related: [-]
20 20 7 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 02/04 11:33 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND DIRECTING CLERK MAILING. CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 motion Contempt Tue 02/04 11:02 AM
MOTION for Contempt Against State Court Judge by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. Responses due by 2/18/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF FILING LEGAL NOTICE TO BLOCK UNLAWFUL INSURANCE INQUIRY, MORTGAGE SERVICER INTERFERENCE by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Tue 02/04 10:58 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. Summons(es) NOT issued for the following reasons: Summons must be submitted using AO 440 form. (caw)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED SUMMONS by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 02/04 10:51 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JUDICIAL MISCONDUCT against Scott Kerner, filed by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne.(caw)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Tue 02/04 10:48 AM
MOTION to Stay of State Proceedings Pending Federal Review by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. Responses due by 2/18/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Sanctions Tue 02/04 10:47 AM
MOTION for Sanctions Against Opposing Counsel by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF FILING FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF FEDERAL QUESTION JURISDICTION by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF FILING JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FEDERAL MANDAMUS PETITION by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Reconsideration Tue 02/04 10:36 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Emergency Injunction by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF FILING JUDICIAL MISCONDUCT COMPLAINT AGAINST SCOTT KERNER by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw) Modified filing date on 2/4/2025 (caw)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF FILING FEDERAL RICO COMPLAINT AGAINST OPPOSING COUNSEL by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF FILING FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (caw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 01/30 10:47 AM
MOTION for Emergency Injunction by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (pcs)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Writ (of Garnishment/Execution/Other) Thu 01/30 10:46 AM
MOTION/PETITION for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1361 by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne. (pcs)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/30 10:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Horne. (pcs)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 01/30 10:43 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/30 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF FEDERAL LAW against Joseph Abruzzo, Scott Kerner, Adam Schwartz. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Johnny Horne, Marlene Horne.(pcs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit