Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Madeleine C Wanslee
Case #: 2:25-bk-00794
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Mar 04, 2025
Dismissed:Feb 19, 2025
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025

Debtor
PARKINSON LAND LLC
772 N Swan Dr
Gilbert, AZ 85234-7621
Represented By
PARKINSON LAND LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
24 24 court Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED) Fri 03/07 8:05 AM
The case having been dismissed; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Judge Madeleine C. Wanslee (RIV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
22 22 vCal CHAP Virtual Minute Entry Thu 02/20 2:34 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 3/5/2025 Subject: Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 ORDER to Show Cause signed on 1/31/2025 (related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition) Order to Show Cause set for 3/5/2025 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference Hearing .
20 20 audio audio Thu 02/20 8:05 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [02/18/2025 02:34:22 PM]. File Size [ 8044 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:57 ]. (audiouser)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/21 10:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice
19 19 order oDismissing Case with Prejudice Wed 02/19 1:11 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice, Debtor Barred Debtor PARKINSON LAND LLC starting 2/19/2025 to 5/20/2025 signed on 2/19/2025 Related [+] . (RIV)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case
18 18 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 02/19 11:58 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Dismissing Case filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE Related [+].(Stewart, Christopher)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 vCal CHAP Minute Entry Thu 02/20 2:31 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 02/18/2025 Subject: Related [+] (TAH)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Case with Prejudice with a Bar from Refiling for 180 Days and for Any Future Filings to be Assigned to the Honorable Madeleine C. Wanslee filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Fri 02/14 10:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint
16 16 2 pgs court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint Wed 02/12 11:51 AM
Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint Notice of Meeting of Creditors. In a Chapter 11 case, the deadline to file a complaint objecting to the discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/11/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephonic Hearing Complaints under Sections 727 or 523 due by 5/12/2025. (MRS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 9 pgs other Joinder Wed 02/05 6:30 PM
Joinder SECURED CREDITOR RON SWANSON HOLDINGS, LLC'S JOINDER TO UNITED STATES TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEBTOR'S BANKRUPTCY WITH PREJUDICE, ETC. filed by DAVID L. KNAPPER of LAW OFFICES OF DAVID L. KNAPPER on behalf of RON SWANSON HOLDINGS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company, aka Ron Swanson Holdings LLC. Related [+] (KNAPPER, DAVID L.)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case
14 14 other Certificate of Service Wed 02/05 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE. Related [+] (Stewart, Christopher)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Hearing
13 13 2 pgs order oSetting Hearing Wed 02/05 2:15 PM
ORDER for Expedited Hearing signed on 2/5/2025 Related [+] Hearing set for 2/18/2025 at 02:30 PM at Videoconference Hearing . (SJF)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case,11 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite
Monday, February 03, 2025
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 02/03 3:14 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order for Expedited Hearing on United States Motion to Dismiss Case filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE Related [+].(Stewart, Christopher)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite
11 11 motion Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to) Mon 02/03 3:12 PM
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Motion for Expedited Hearing Re: United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE Related [+]. (Stewart, Christopher)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case
10 10 11 pgs motion Dismiss Case (Motion to) Mon 02/03 3:07 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Case with Prejudice with a Bar from Refiling for 180 Days and for Any Future Filings to be Assigned to the Honorable Madeleine C. Wanslee filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE. (Stewart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 02/02 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order to Show Cause
7 7 notice Appearance (Notice of) Fri 01/31 11:44 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by DAVID L. KNAPPER of LAW OFFICES OF DAVID L. KNAPPER on behalf of RON SWANSON HOLDINGS, LLC an Arizona limited liability company, aka Ron Swanson Holdings LLC.(KNAPPER, DAVID L.)
Related: [-]
6 6 order oOrder to Show Cause Fri 01/31 3:35 PM
ORDER to Show Cause signed on 1/31/2025 Related [+] Order to Show Cause set for 3/5/2025 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference Hearing . (SJF)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
court Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings Fri 01/31 5:52 AM
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor PARKINSON LAND LLC Case Number[LINK 24-09552 , Chapter 11 filed in Arizona Bankruptcy Court on 11/07/2024 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/27/2025.(Admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/01 10:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
5 5 other Initial Mailing List Thu 01/30 1:55 PM
Master Mailing List filed by PARKINSON LAND LLC. (MRS)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance (Notice of) Thu 01/30 11:17 AM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Thu 01/30 9:37 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (LAR)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Thu 01/30 9:32 AM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 3/4/2025 at 11:15 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (LAR)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs other 2Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Thu 01/30 9:32 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Schedules/Statements due by 2/13/2025, filed by PARKINSON LAND LLC (LAR) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2025 (MRS)
Related: [-]
court Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case) Thu 01/30 6:45 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee- $1,738.00 from PARKINSON LAND LLC. Receipt Number 22004157. (LR) (admin)
Related: [-]